Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:24-bk-11007
Case Filed:May 14, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Joonko Diversity Inc.
157 Columbus Avenue, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10023
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Mar 21, 2025 4:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
BMC Group, Inc.
www.bmcgroup.com Attn: Claims Processing PO Box 90100
Los Angeles, CA 90009
Represented By
Steven Phillip Ordaz
Bmc Group
contact info
Creditor
Internal Revenue Service
Represented By
Gokce Tugce Yurekli
Tax Division, U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Interested Party
Insight Venture Management, LLC
Represented By
Cory D. Kandestin
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Interested Party
Timberline TMG, LLC
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Timberline Holdings III, LLC
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Elad Shmilovich
Interested Party
Ilit Raz
Represented By
Zhao Liu
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Christopher E Prince
Lesnick Prince Pappas & Alverson LLP
contact info
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Matt Lesnick
Lesnick Prince Pappas, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Kapor Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Kapor Capital
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
First Avenue Ventures, LLC
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Peera Feldman
Interested Party
Martin Damsky
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Heidi Damsky
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Bronze Valley Corp.
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
BHM Venture Investments, LLC
Represented By
Minyao Wang
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Rafael Xavier Zahralddin-Aravena
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Mediator
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell 1201 N. Market Street P.O. Box 1347
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Spec. Counsel
Bayard, P.A.
600 N. King Street Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Ericka Fredricks Johnson
Bayard P.A.
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange St
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Linda Richenderfer
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info
Linda J. Casey
Office Of United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
346 346 misc Declaration Thu 05/01 1:59 PM
Declaration of Ordinary Course Professional (KPMG) Related [+] Filed by Joonko Diversity Inc.. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-] 54
Thursday, April 24, 2025
345 345 order Compel Thu 04/24 12:51 PM
Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Claimant Ilit Raz's Motion To Compel Compliance with Third Party Subpoena to Insight Venture Management , L.L.C. Related [+] Signed on 4/24/2025. (LMC)
Related: [-] 294 ,295 ,299 ,309 ,344