Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11007

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:25-ap-50255
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ilit Raz
315 West Ninth Street, Suite 705
Los Angeles, CA 90015
Represented By
Ilit Raz
contact info
Plaintiff
Joonko Diversity Inc.
157 Columbus Avenue, 4th Floor
New York, NY 10023
Represented By
David R. Hurst
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Catherine Lee
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Joel C. Haims
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info
Kevin M. Regan
Mcdermott Will & Emery LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
8 8 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 05/02 10:05 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Joonko Diversity Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
7 7 misc Transcript Mon 04/21 8:30 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/15/25 RE: Omnibus, Fees. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/21/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliabe, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by Joonko Diversity Inc. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/28/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/12/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/22/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/21/2025. (JC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 04/15 10:53 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]; Filed by BMC Group, Inc.. (Ordaz, Steven)
Related: [-] 331 , Case No. 24-11007 (MFW)3
5 5 court Minute Entry Tue 04/15 11:52 AM
MINUTE ENTRY Re: Related [+] APPEARANCES: See attached sign-in sheet MATTERS: 1) Order entered under CNO, 2) Pretrial conference held and further status conference scheduled for 5/6/25 at 10:00 am, 3) Order entered under COC (lmc)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 4/15/25
Friday, April 11, 2025
4 4 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice (Multi) Fri 04/11 10:19 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Joonko Diversity Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 4/15/2025 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit Fri 04/11 9:39 AM
Exhibit(s) // Notice of Filing of Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order Filed by Joonko Diversity Inc.. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, February 13, 2025
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 02/13 3:24 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50255 MFW] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12026521, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp RETIRED - Complaint Thu 02/13 3:22 PM
Adversary case 25-50255 Complaint by Joonko Diversity Inc. against Ilit Raz. Fee Amount $350 (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))). AP Summons Served due date: 5/14/2025. (Hurst, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Att: 7 Exhibit G
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Att: 9 Exhibit I