Member Case
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 4:24-bk-41734
Case Filed:May 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tommy's Holding Company, LLC
120 Ottawa Ave NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2807
Represented By
Elizabeth Nicolle Boydston
Gutnicki LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (generic) Fri 11/08 1:24 PM
Notice AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULE D IN THE SCHEDULES OF ALL OF THE DEBTORS filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
19 19 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 07/22 5:07 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
18 18 misc Schedules Mon 07/22 5:02 PM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
17 17 order Extend/Shorten time Tue 07/02 10:25 AM
Order granting16 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule D due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule E/F due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule G due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule H due 7/8/2024 for4 , Creditor matrix due 7/8/2024 for4 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2024 for4 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/8/2024 for4 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/8/2024 for4 , Entered on 7/2/2024. (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency
Monday, June 24, 2024
16 16 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 07/02 10:22 AM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Related [+] Filed by Trustee Mark Andrews (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-] 13 Order on motion to extend/shorten time
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
13 13 order Extend/Shorten time Tue 05/28 9:57 AM
Order granting7 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule D due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule E/F due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule G due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule H due 6/24/2024 for4 , Creditor matrix due 6/24/2024 for4 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/24/2024 for4 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/24/2024 for4 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/24/2024 for4 , Declaration for electronic filing due 6/24/2024 for4 , Entered on 5/28/2024. (Dozier, Bryan)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency
Sunday, May 26, 2024
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 05/26 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024.
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 order Joint administration Fri 05/24 11:02 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:24-bk-90000 with member case 4:24-bk-41734 Related [+]. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC, Case No. 24-90000 11 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Entered on 5/24/2024. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, May 23, 2024
10 10 court BNC certificate of mailing Thu 05/23 11:20 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/3/2024. Schedule D due 6/3/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/3/2024. Schedule G due 6/3/2024. Schedule H due 6/3/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/3/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/3/2024. Declaration for electronic filing is due within 7 days from the filing of the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/3/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024.
9 9 court Hearing held Thu 05/23 5:13 PM
Hearing held on 5/23/2024. Related [+] ***GRANTED*** (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90007 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, and 24-90015 11 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC
8 8 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 05/23 2:19 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 motion Extend/Shorten time Wed 05/22 5:33 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC (Rahn, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Amended petition Wed 05/22 4:24 PM
Amended voluntary petition by a non-individual filed for the following: add county . filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC Related [+]. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
5 5 court Hearing set/continued Wed 05/22 3:32 PM
Hearing set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris for2 , (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90007 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, and 24-90015 11 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Tue 05/21 4:52 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/3/2024. Schedule D due 6/3/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/3/2024. Schedule G due 6/3/2024. Schedule H due 6/3/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/3/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/3/2024. Declaration for electronic filing is due within 7 days from the filing of the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/3/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 05/21 4:50 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended voluntary petition to include debtor's county of residence from attorney for debtor. Related [+] Responses due by 5/31/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] 1 Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommy's Holding Company, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/17/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/17/2024.
2 2 19 pgs motion Joint administration Tue 05/21 12:05 PM
Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90007 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, and 24-90015 11 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Holding Company, LLC (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Mon 05/20 11:10 PM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommy's Holding Company, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/17/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/17/2024. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Mon 05/20 11:11 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-41734 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31434235, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1