Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 9:24-bk-90000
Case Filed:May 20, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tommy's Fort Worth, LLC
9804 Camp Bowie West Blvd
Fort Worth, TX 76116-1210
Represented By
Elizabeth Nicolle Boydston
Gutnicki LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
888 888 misc Certificate of service Thu 05/08 1:48 PM
Certificate of service re: Trustees First Omnibus Objection to Claims [Docket No. 872] Filed by Claims Agent Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 872 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s).. Filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews. Responses due by 5/30/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B) filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews
887 887 order Leave (Not for Appeal use) Thu 05/08 9:31 AM
Order granting motion to Appear Without Local Counsel and/or to Waive Local Counsel Requirement Related [+] Entered on 5/8/2025. (Chambers, Deanna)
Related: [-] 867
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
886 886 misc Certificate of service Tue 05/06 4:28 PM
Certificate of service re: Trustees Witness and Exhibit List for Hearings Scheduled on May 1, 2025 [Docket No. 871] Filed by Claims Agent Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 871 Witness and Exhibit List for Hearings Scheduled on May 1, 2025 filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)839 Motion for leave Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Disclosure Statement, (II) Approving the Solicitation and Notice Procedures with Respect to Confirmation of the Chapter 11 Plan, (III) Approving the Forms of Ballots and Notices in Conne). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5 # 6 Exhibit 6 # 7 Exhibit 7 # 8 Exhibit 8 # 9 Exhibit 9 # 10 Exhibit 10 # 11 Exhibit 11 # 12 Exhibit 12 # 13 Exhibit 13 # 14 Exhibit 14 # 15 Exhibit 15) filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews
885 885 motion Compromise controversy Tue 05/06 2:42 PM
Motion to compromise controversy with WorldPay, LLC and JLB Property Holdings, LLC. Related AP case numbers: 25-09028 Related defendants: WorldPay, LLC. Filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Objections due by 5/30/2025. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
884 884 notice Notice of hearing Fri 05/02 6:38 PM
Notice of hearing on Confirmation of Trustee's First Amended Plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm.. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 879 Modified chapter 11 plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)868 Chapter 11 plan).
883 883 notice Notice of hearing Fri 05/02 6:35 PM
Notice of hearing filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. for872 , (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 872 Omnibus Objection to claim(s) of Creditor(s).. Filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews. Responses due by 5/30/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)
882 882 order Approving disclosure statement Fri 05/02 10:10 AM
Order Approving Disclosure Statement, Approving Solicitation and Notice Procedures, Approving the Form of Ballots and Scheduling Certain Dates with Respect Thereto re:879 Chapter 11 plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews,880 Disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews. Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM Ft. Worth, Judge Morris Ctrm. Last day to Object to Confirmation 6/5/2025. Ballots due 6/5/2025. Entered on 5/2/2025 (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
881 881 notice Notice (generic) Thu 05/01 7:44 PM
Notice of Solicitation Versions of the Plan and Disclosure Statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 868 Amended chapter 11 plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)835 Chapter 11 plan).,869 Amended disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)838 Disclosure statement).,879 Modified chapter 11 plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)868 Chapter 11 plan).,880 Amended disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (RE: related document(s)869 Disclosure statement).
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plan Redline
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Disclosure Statement Redline
880 880 plan Disclosure statement Thu 05/01 7:39 PM
Amended disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 869 Disclosure statement
879 879 plan Chapter 11 plan Thu 05/01 7:35 PM
Modified chapter 11 plan filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 868 Chapter 11 plan
878 878 notice Notice (generic) Thu 05/01 7:12 PM
Notice of Revised Proposed Order (post-hearing) filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 839 Motion for leave Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Disclosure Statement, (II) Approving the Solicitation and Notice Procedures with Respect to Confirmation of the Chapter 11 Plan, (III) Approving the Forms of Ballots and Notices in Connection Therewith, (IV) Scheduling Certain Dates with Respect Thereto, and (V) Granting Related Relief (related document(s)838 Disclosure statement) Filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews Objections due by 4/28/2025. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Redline of Revised Proposed Order
877 877 court Court admitted exhibits Thu 05/01 5:17 PM
Court admitted exhibits date of hearing 5/1/2025 re:869 Amended disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-]
876 876 court Hearing held Thu 05/01 5:16 PM
Hearing held on 5/1/2025 re:869 Amended disclosure statement filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews ***DISCLOSURE STATEMENT RE: AMENDED PLAN AT DKT868 APPROVED*** (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-]
875 875 court Hearing held Thu 05/01 5:12 PM
Hearing held on 5/1/2025 re:839 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving the Disclosure Statement, (II) Approving the Solicitation and Notice Procedures with Respect to Confirmation of the Chapter 11 Plan, (III) Approving the Forms of Ballots and Notices in Connection Therewith, (IV) Scheduling Certain Dates with Respect Thereto, and (V) Granting Related Relief filed by Trustee Mark E. Andrews ***GRANTED*** (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-]