Tommy's California Fresno, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Edward L Morris |
Case #: | 9:24-bk-90005 |
Case Filed: | May 20, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tommys California Fresno, LLC
120 Ottawa Ave NW # Nm
Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2807 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202 |
Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 30, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Alejandra Garcia Castro filed by Creditor Volvo Penta of the Americas, LLC. (Garcia Castro, Alejandra) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Notice AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULE D IN THE SCHEDULES OF ALL OF THE DEBTORS filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order granting16 Motion to extend time. Schedule A/B due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule D due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule E/F due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule G due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule H due 7/8/2024 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2024 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/8/2024 for2 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/8/2024 for2 , Entered on 7/2/2024. (Nunns, Tracy) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trustee Mark Andrews Objections due by 6/28/2024. (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Sunday, May 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order granting7 Motion to extend time. Schedule A/B due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule D due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule E/F due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule G due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule H due 6/24/2024 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/24/2024 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/24/2024 for2 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/24/2024 for2 , Declaration for electronic filing due 6/24/2024 for2 , Entered on 5/24/2024. (Nunns, Tracy) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:24-bk-90000 with member case 9:24-bk-90005 . An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC, Case No. 24-90000 11 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Entered on 5/24/2024. (Spelmon, T) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
9 | 9
court
Hearing held
Thu 05/23 5:03 PM
Hearing held on 5/23/2024. ***GRANTED*** (Warren, Shelley) |
|
8 | 8
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11
Thu 05/23 2:10 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024. (Nixon, Sandra) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC (Rahn, Alexandria) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Amended voluntary petition by a non-individual filed for the following: add county . filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC . (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
5 | 5
court
Hearing set/continued
Wed 05/22 3:17 PM
Hearing set Hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris for4 , (Warren, Shelley) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90007 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, 24-90015 11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Fresno, LLC (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Clerk's correspondence requesting Amended petition to include answer to questions 6,7,8 from attorney for debtor. Responses due by 5/28/2024. (Dozier, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/3/2024. Schedule D due 6/3/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/3/2024. Schedule G due 6/3/2024. Schedule H due 6/3/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/3/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/3/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days of filing the petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/3/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024. (Dozier, Bryan) Modified on 5/21/2024 (Dozier, Bryan) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommys California Fresno, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/17/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/17/2024. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/20 11:55 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-90005 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31434281, amount $1738.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |