Member Case
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Edward L Morris
Case #: 9:24-bk-90007
Case Filed:May 21, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tommy's California Ventura, LLC
120 Ottawa Ave NW
Grand Rapids, MI 49503-2807
Represented By
Alexandria Rahn
Gutnicki LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
21 21 notice Notice (generic) Fri 11/08 1:16 PM
Notice AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULE D IN THE SCHEDULES OF ALL OF THE DEBTORS filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
20 20 misc Schedules Wed 07/31 11:16 AM
Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
19 19 court Clerk's correspondence Tue 07/23 9:23 AM
Clerk's correspondence requesting the re-docketing of the schedules, using the correct docket event (schedules). from attorney for trustee. Related [+] Responses due by 7/26/2024. (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-] 17 INCORRECT ENTRY: Incorrect docket event used. Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC (RE: related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency). (Kaufman, Aaron) Modified text on 7/23/2024 .
Monday, July 22, 2024
18 18 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 07/22 7:57 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Statement of financial affairs Mon 07/22 7:56 PM
Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC Related [+]. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
16 16 order Extend/Shorten time Tue 07/02 10:46 AM
Order granting15 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule D due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule E/F due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule G due 7/8/2024 for4 , Schedule H due 7/8/2024 for4 , Creditor matrix due 7/8/2024 for4 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2024 for4 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/8/2024 for4 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/8/2024 for4 , Entered on 7/2/2024. (Nunns, Tracy)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency,15 Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
15 15 motion Extend/Shorten time Tue 06/25 2:24 PM
Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trustee Mark Andrews Objections due by 6/28/2024. (Kaufman, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 26, 2024
12 12 court BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors Sun 05/26 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024.
Friday, May 24, 2024
11 11 court BNC certificate of mailing Fri 05/24 11:18 PM
BNC certificate of mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/4/2024. Schedule D due 6/4/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/4/2024. Schedule G due 6/4/2024. Schedule H due 6/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/4/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days from date of petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/4/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/24/2024. (Ecker, C.)
10 10 order Extend/Shorten time Fri 05/24 5:06 PM
Order granting6 Motion to extend time. Related [+] Schedule A/B due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule D due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule E/F due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule G due 6/24/2024 for4 , Schedule H due 6/24/2024 for4 , Creditor matrix due 6/24/2024 for4 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/24/2024 for4 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/24/2024 for4 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/24/2024 for4 , Declaration for electronic filing due 6/24/2024 for4 , Entered on 5/24/2024. (Hyden, Kara)
Related: [-] related document(s)4 Notice of deficiency
9 9 order Joint administration Fri 05/24 10:51 AM
Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:24-bk-90000 with member case 9:24-bk-90007 Related [+]. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC, Case No. 24-90000 11 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Entered on 5/24/2024. (Spelmon, T)
Related: [-] 2
Thursday, May 23, 2024
8 8 court Hearing held Thu 05/23 5:06 PM
Hearing held on 5/23/2024. Related [+] ***GRANTED*** (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, 24-90015 11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC
7 7 court Meeting of creditors chapter 11 Thu 05/23 2:12 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024. (Nixon, Sandra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten time Wed 05/22 5:24 PM
Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC (Rahn, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Amended petition Wed 05/22 4:15 PM
Amended voluntary petition by a non-individual filed for the following: add county . filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC Related [+]. (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary petition (chapter 11)
4 4 court Notice of deficiency Wed 05/22 3:52 PM
Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/4/2024. Schedule D due 6/4/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/4/2024. Schedule G due 6/4/2024. Schedule H due 6/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/4/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due within 7 days from date of petition. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/4/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/24/2024. (Ecker, C.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Hearing set/continued Wed 05/22 3:19 PM
Hearing set Related [+] Hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris for2 , (Warren, Shelley)
Related: [-] 2 Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, 24-90015 11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
2 2 motion Joint administration Tue 05/21 11:50 AM
Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90011 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, 24-90015 11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's California Ventura, LLC (Boydston, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary petition ch 11 (attorney filer) Tue 05/21 12:03 AM
Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommy's California Ventura, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/18/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/18/2024. (Rahn, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 05/21 12:36 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-90007 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31434299, amount $1738.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1