Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000
Lead case is: 9:24-bk-90000
Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Edward L Morris |
Case #: | 9:24-bk-90011 |
Case Filed: | May 21, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC
11361 Folsom Blvd
Rancho Cordova, CA 95742-6224 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
1100 Commerce Street Room 976
Dallas, TX 75202 |
Docket last updated: 11 minutes ago |
Friday, November 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Notice AMENDMENT OF SCHEDULE D IN THE SCHEDULES OF ALL OF THE DEBTORS filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC. (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() Statement of financial affairs for a non-individual . Filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Schedules: Schedules A-B and D-H with Summary of Assets and Liabilities (with Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors,). Filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC . (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Order granting15 Motion to extend time. Schedule A/B due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule D due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule E/F due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule G due 7/8/2024 for2 , Schedule H due 7/8/2024 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 7/8/2024 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 7/8/2024 for2 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 7/8/2024 for2 , Entered on 7/2/2024. (Nunns, Tracy) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Motion to extend time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, and Statements of Financial Affairs, and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Trustee Mark Andrews Objections due by 6/28/2024. (Kaufman, Aaron) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order granting6 Motion to extend time. Schedule A/B due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule D due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule E/F due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule G due 6/24/2024 for2 , Schedule H due 6/24/2024 for2 , Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/24/2024 for2 , Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/24/2024 for2 , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/24/2024 for2 , Declaration for electronic filing due 6/24/2024 for2 , Entered on 5/28/2024. (Spelmon, T) |
|
Sunday, May 26, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC certificate of mailing - meeting of creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/26/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Order granting motion for joint administration lead case 9:24-bk-90000 with member case 9:24-bk-90011 . An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the Chapter 11 Cases of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC and its affiliates that have concurrently commenced chapter 11 cases. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Tommys Fort Worth, LLC, Case No. 24-90000 11 should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Entered on 5/24/2024. (Spelmon, T) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() BNC certificate of mailing. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/23/2024. (Admin.) |
|
8 | 8
court
Hearing held
Thu 05/23 5:10 PM
Hearing held on 5/23/2024. ***GRANTED*** (Warren, Shelley) |
|
7 | 7
court
Meeting of creditors chapter 11
Thu 05/23 2:15 PM
Meeting of creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 7/1/2024 at 10:30 AM by TELEPHONE. Proofs of Claims due by 9/30/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/18/2024. (Nixon, Sandra) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion to extend time to file schedules or new case deficiencies, excluding matrix Filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC (Rahn, Alexandria) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Amended voluntary petition by a non-individual filed for the following: add county . filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC . (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
4 | 4
court
Hearing set/continued
Wed 05/22 3:22 PM
Hearing set Hearing to be held on 5/23/2024 at 01:30 PM at https://us-courts.webex.com/meet/morris for3 , (Warren, Shelley) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Motion for joint administration of cases 24-90000 11, 24-90001 11, 24-90002 11, 24-90003 11, 24-90004 11, 24-90005 11, 24-90006 11, 24-90007 11, 24-90008 11, 24-90009 11, 24-90010 11, 24-90012 11, 24-90013 11, 24-90014 11, 24-90015 11, and 24-41734 Filed by Debtor Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC (Boydston, Elizabeth) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of deficiency. Schedule A/B due 6/4/2024. Schedule D due 6/4/2024. Schedule E/F due 6/4/2024. Schedule G due 6/4/2024. Schedule H due 6/4/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-individual Debtors due 6/4/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information due 6/4/2024. Declaration for electronic filing due 6/4/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 6/4/2024. Creditor matrix due 5/23/2024. (Chambers, Deanna) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Non-individual Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Tommy's Rancho Cordova, LLC Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/18/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 09/18/2024. (Rahn, Alexandria) |
|
crditcrd
none
Tue 05/21 12:41 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary petition (chapter 11)([LINK 24-90011 11] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A31434306, amount $1738.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |