Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20240

Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James R Ahler
Case #: 2:24-ap-02025
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott Joseph Fitts
945 Lake Street
Crown Point, IN 46307
Represented By
Scott Joseph Fitts
contact info
Plaintiff
NextGear Capital, Inc.
11799 North College Avenue
Carmel, IN 46032
Represented By
David J. Jurkiewicz
Bose Mckinney & Evans LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Nancy J. Gargula
100 East Wayne Street, 5th Floor
South Bend, IN 46601


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM EDT
Thursday, February 27, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Fri 02/28 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 02/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Docket Entry (Hrg)
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
18 18 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Tue 02/25 2:33 PM
Docket Entry: In light of the Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Fact Discovery (Docket No. 17), the Court now continues the telephonic pre-trial conference as to this Compliant from March 14, 2025 at 9:30 A.M. to June 11, 2025 at 11:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. Participants in the hearing should call (571) 353-2301 and use ID 018194371 shortly before the appointed time and wait quietly for the case to be called. If at all possible, participants should use a landline and not a cell phone. Related [+]. (tdm)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
17 17 order Extend Time Tue 02/25 11:55 AM
Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Fact Discovery Related [+].
Related: [-] 16 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Fact Discoverye
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 motion Extend Time(BK) Wed 02/12 5:17 PM
Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Complete Fact Discovery Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David) Modified on 2/13/2025 Related [+]
Related: [-] e
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 05, 2024
15 15 court Docket Entry (Hrg)(AP) Thu 09/05 2:00 PM
Docket Entry: Hearing held August 30, 2024 Related [+]. APPEARANCES: Attorney Jurkiewicz on behalf of Plaintiff and Attorney Freeland on behalf of Defendant. By agreement, the parties agree to set a discovery deadline and then reconvene to assess further trial dates. By agreement, all fact discovery shall be completed by March 3, 2025. Further, the parties shall appear telephonically for a PreTrial on March 14, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Thu 08/29 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
Monday, August 26, 2024
13 13 order Appear Telephonically Mon 08/26 3:13 PM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Appear Telephonically Related [+]
Related: [-] 11 Motion To Appear Telephonically e
Saturday, August 17, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Auto) Sun 08/18 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 08/17/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Docket Entry
11 11 motion Telephonic Hearing(AP) Sat 08/17 11:55 AM
Motion and Request to Appear Telephonically Filed by Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts Related [+] (Freeland, Daniel) Modified on 8/19/2024
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by NextGear Capital, Inc.e
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
10 10 court Docket Entry(AP) Thu 08/15 4:41 PM
Docket Entry: Order for Telephonic hearing: the hearing in this matter scheduled for August 30, 2024 @ 9:30 a.m. will be held telephonically. Any party desiring to participate in the hearing should call (888) 684-8852 and use Access Code 7803515 shortly before the appointed time and wait quietly for the case to be called. If at all possible, participants should use a landline and not a cell phone. Related [+]. (kdr)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.
9 9 order Set Conference Thu 08/15 2:56 PM
Order for Initial Pre-Trial Conference Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/30/2024 at 09:30 AM at Hammond - 3rd Floor, Courtroom 8.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc.e
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 11:30 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts (Freeland, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Enlargement of Time Thu 06/27 2:02 PM
Notice of Enlargement of Time to file response to Complaint up to July 29, 2024 Filed by Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts Related [+] (Freeland, Daniel)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by NextGear Capital, Inc.
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance(AP) Thu 06/27 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance by Daniel L. Freeland Filed by Defendant Scott Joseph Fitts (Freeland, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 06/26 12:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons on Scott Joseph Fitts 5/22/2024 . (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 05/21 3:17 PM
Summons Issued on Scott Joseph Fitts Date Issued 5/21/2024, Answer Due 6/20/2024. (mkp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
3 3 misc Statement of Corp. Ownership Mon 05/20 3:32 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Cox Automotive, Inc., Manheim Investments, Inc.. Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance(AP) Mon 05/20 3:22 PM
Notice of Appearance by David J. Jurkiewicz Filed by Plaintiff NextGear Capital, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 05/20 3:12 PM
Adversary case 24-02025 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud),67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Complaint by NextGear Capital, Inc. against Scott Joseph Fitts. Fee Amount $350. (Jurkiewicz, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Guaranty
Att: 4 Exhibit D - SOT Vehicles
Att: 5 Exhibit E - 231 Auto Exchange OVE Purchase and Sale Dates
Att: 6 Exhibit F - OVE BOS - 231
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Dunn Deals OVE Purchase and Sale Dates
Att: 8 Exhibit H - OVE BOS - Dunn Deals