PacerMonitor
A Fitch Solutions Service
Features
Plans & Pricing
About
Home
Features
Pricing
Getting Started
About Us
Start Free Trial
Sign In
Admin Login
Scott Joseph Fitts
Indiana Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Case #:
2:24-bk-20240
Case Filed:
Feb 19, 2024
Docket
Parties
Related Cases (4)
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Adversary
2:24-ap-02015 - XL Funding, LLC d/b/a Axle Funding LLC v. Fitts
03/26/2024
Adversary
2:24-ap-02025 - NextGear Capital, Inc. v. Fitts
05/20/2024
Adversary
2:24-ap-02040 - Chicagoland Independent Auction, Inc. v. Fitts
10/29/2024
Adversary
2:25-ap-02001 - Dealer Preferred Capital, Inc. v. Fitts
01/03/2025
Create an account to get the full docket for this case.
Continue to Create Account