California Northern District Court
Judge:Peter H Kang
Case #: 3:24-cv-03089
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:May 22, 2024
Re-opened:Jul 05, 2024
Terminated:Jun 12, 2024
Last checked: Monday Nov 18, 2024 12:23 AM PST
Defendant
Renesas Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By
Jason A. Crotty
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
Benjamin Charkow
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
Plaintiff
Koji IP, LLC
Represented By
Susan S.Q. Kalra
Ramey LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 29 2024
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. In-Person Hearing set for September 19, 2024 at 10:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. Responses due September 12, 2024. Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 08/29/24. (phklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2024)
GPO Mar 26 2025
ORDER REGARDING OSC AND IMPOSING SANCTIONS ON RAMEY FIRM LAWYERS.Signed by Judge Peter H. Kang on 03/26/2025. (phklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2025)
GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Peter H Kang GRANTING 18 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Sanctions. (phklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2025)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
108 108 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Thu 05/15 10:37 AM
REPLY Related [+] filed byKoji IP, LLC. (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-] 89 MOTION to Alter Judgment Dkt. No. 43
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
107 107 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Wed 05/14 5:25 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byKoji IP, LLC.(Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-] 79 MOTION to Amend a Judgment Pursuant to Rule 59
Att: 1 Exhibit A
106 106 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 1:17 PM
NOTICE by Koji IP, LLC re43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice of Compliance for Jeffrey E. Kubiak (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
105 105 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 1:16 PM
NOTICE by Koji IP, LLC re43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice of Compliance for William P. Ramey, III (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
104 104 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 1:15 PM
NOTICE by Koji IP, LLC re43 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Notice of Compliance for Susan Kalra (Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
103 103 order Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Tue 05/13 8:14 AM
ORDER by Judge Peter H. Kang GRANTING 98 Administrative Motion to Reset and Consolidate Hearings; GRANTING 100 Administrative Motion to Appear by Remote Means. The Hearing on the79 89 Motions is RESET for July 18, 2025 at 01:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (phklc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
102 102 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/09 12:27 PM
MOTION affirms the objection and sets Aside the Magistrates Order re 81 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11,,,,,,,,, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Koji IP, LLC. Responses due by 5/23/2025. Replies due by 5/30/2025.(Kalra, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order