Original Case: 3:24-cv-03089

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-01639
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Apr 11, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 14, 2025 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
RENESAS ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Jason A. Crotty
Maschoff Brennan
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KOJI IP, LLC
Represented By
Susan Kalra
Attorney
contact info
Sanctioned Party - Appellant
WILLIAM PETERSON RAMEY, III
Represented By
William Peterson Ramey III
Ramey LLP
contact info
Sanctioned Party - Appellant
JEFFREY E. KUBIAK
Represented By
Jeffrey E. Kubiak
Ramey LLP
contact info
Sanctioned Party - Appellant
SUSAN KALRA, Attorney
Represented By
Susan Kalra
Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/14/2025 4:16 AM EDT
Friday, April 11, 2025
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 04/09/2025. [1081993] Entry of Appearance is due on 04/25/2025. Certificate of Interest is due on 04/25/2025. Docketing Statement is due on 04/25/2025. Appellant's brief is due on 06/10/2025. [JSP] [Entered: 04/11/2025 11:53 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 91 pgs Civil Case Docketed
2 2 2 pgs Official caption revised to add additional appellants to the caption. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [1082137] [JSP] [Entered: 04/11/2025 04:47 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs Entry of Appearance for William P. Ramey, III as counsel for Appellants Koji IP, LLC, William Peterson Ramey, III, Susan Kalra and Jeffrey E. Kubiak. Service: 04/11/2025 by email, US mail. [1082147] 25-1639 [William Ramey] [Entered: 04/11/2025 05:07 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs Certificate of Interest for Appellants Koji IP, LLC, William Peterson Ramey, III, Susan Kalra and Jeffrey E. Kubiak. Service: 04/11/2025 by email, US mail. [1082148] 25-1639 [William Ramey] [Entered: 04/11/2025 05:08 PM]
Related: [-]