Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-31641

Texas Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Michelle V Larson
Case #: 3:24-ap-03037
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:May 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,
Represented By
MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,
contact info
Defendant
1Path Managed Services, LLC
Represented By
1Path Managed Services, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.
Represented By
Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Onepath Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Onepath Holdings, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onepath Holding Corporation
Represented By
Onepath Holding Corporation
contact info
Defendant
BlueWave Computing, LLC
Represented By
BlueWave Computing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Onepath Systems of NC, LLC
Represented By
Onepath Systems of NC, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Direct Resources, LLC
Represented By
Direct Resources, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Internet & Telephone, LLC
Represented By
Internet & Telephone, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott M. Seidel
Represented By
Davor Rukavina
Munsch Hardt Kopf & Harr, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:10 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
47 47 answer Answer to complaint Tue 02/18 3:09 PM
Answer to complaint /Defendants' Answer to Trustee's Original Complaint filed by 1Path Managed Services, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
46 46 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 02/13 11:25 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45 Agreed Scheduling Order (RE: related document(s)1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel). Trial Docket Call date set for 12/2/2025 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 2/11/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
45 45 order Set or continue hearing Tue 02/11 4:09 PM
Agreed Scheduling Order Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 12/2/2025 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 2/11/2025 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
court Hearing not held Thu 02/06 8:16 PM
Hearing NOT held on 2/4/2025. Related [+] (TO BE RESET; PARTIES TO UPLOAD A NEW SCHEDULING ORDER) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-03037 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,, 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath Holding Corporation, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)).
Sunday, January 12, 2025
44 44 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 01/12 11:21 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/12/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 43 Memorandum of opinion Denying In Part and Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (RE: related document(s)15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.). Entered on 1/10/2025
Friday, January 10, 2025
43 43 32 pgs order Memorandum of opinion Fri 01/10 4:00 PM
Memorandum of opinion Denying In Part and Granting In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Related [+]. Entered on 1/10/2025 (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
Friday, January 03, 2025
42 42 court Hearing set/continued Fri 01/03 12:35 PM
Trial Docket Call reset Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 2/4/2025 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-03037 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,, 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath Holding Corporation, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
41 41 court Hearing set/continued Wed 10/30 11:04 AM
Trial Docket Call reset Related [+] Trial Docket Call date set for 1/7/2025 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-03037 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,, 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath Holding Corporation, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet). Nature(s) of suit: 13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer). 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Thursday, October 10, 2024
40 40 2 pgs order Order (generic) Fri 10/11 11:36 AM
DISTRICT COURT ORDER: 3:24-cv-02294-S - Having reviewed the Motion, Trustee's Response Opposed to the Motion [ECF No. 1 -2], Defendants' Reply to Trustee's Response to the Motion [ECF No. 1 -3], Defendants' Limited Objection to the Report [ECF No. 7 ], the Court ACCEPTS the Report. Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Motion only to the extent that the reference in the Adversary Proceeding will be withdrawn when the Bankruptcy Court certifies that the Adversary Proceeding is trial-ready. this case is ABATED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending withdrawal of the reference. This abatement is without prejudice to the case being reopened upon motion by any party Related [+]. Entered on 10/10/2024 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 34 Report and recommendation
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
39 39 court Transcript Wed 09/25 8:26 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/29/24 RE: Motion to dismiss. THIS TRANSCRIPT WILL BE MADE ELECTRONICALLY AVAILABLE TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC 90 DAYS AFTER THE DATE OF FILING. TRANSCRIPT RELEASE DATE IS 12/24/2024. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the official court transcriber. Court Reporter/Transcriber J&J Court Transcribers, Inc., Telephone number 609-586-2311. Related [+]. Transcript to be made available to the public on 12/24/2024. (Bowen, James)
Related: [-] 31 Hearing held on 8/29/2024. (RE: related document(s)15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Proposed Order),16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)) (Counsel appeared for Plaintiff-Chapter 7 Trustee (S. Seidel) and the Defendants. Status Conference held with respect to Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Defendants do not consent to Bankruptcy Court issued final orders. Court to issue Report and Recommendation in due course. Oral argument taken on Motion to Dismiss. Matter taken under advisement.)
Monday, September 23, 2024
38 38 court Request for transcript Mon 09/23 9:34 AM
Request for transcript (ENTIRE HEARING) regarding a hearing held on 8/29/2024. The requested turn-around time is daily (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 15, 2024
37 37 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Sun 09/15 11:17 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Report and recommendation to the U.S. District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (RE: related document(s)16 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.). Entered on 9/13/2024 (Blanco, J.)
Friday, September 13, 2024
36 36 court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Fri 09/13 12:49 PM
DISTRICT COURT Notice of transmission of Report and recommendation in RE: Motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 3:24-cv-02294-S Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 34 Report and recommendation to the U.S. District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. (RE: related document(s)16 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.). Entered on 9/13/2024 (Blanco, J.)
34 34 9 pgs court Report and recommendation Fri 09/13 12:40 PM
Report and recommendation to the U.S. District Court by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge. Related [+]. Entered on 9/13/2024 (Blanco, J.)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for withdrawal of reference filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
Monday, September 09, 2024
33 33 court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Tue 09/10 11:12 AM
DUPLICATE. See document 32. DISTRICT COURT Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 3:24-cv-02294-K Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua) Modified on 9/10/2024 (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
32 32 court Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference Mon 09/09 12:56 PM
Notice of transmission of motion to withdraw reference re: Civil Case # 3:24-cv-02294-K Related [+] (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Thursday, August 29, 2024
31 31 court Hearing held Fri 08/30 8:51 AM
Hearing held on 8/29/2024. Related [+] (Counsel appeared for Plaintiff-Chapter 7 Trustee (S. Seidel) and the Defendants. Status Conference held with respect to Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Defendants do not consent to Bankruptcy Court issued final orders. Court to issue Report and Recommendation in due course. Oral argument taken on Motion to Dismiss. Matter taken under advisement.) (Jeng, Hawaii)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Proposed Order),16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Monday, August 26, 2024
30 30 answer Reply Mon 08/26 2:32 PM
Reply to Related [+] /Defendants' Reply to the Trustee's Objection to the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 28 Objection filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
29 29 answer Reply Wed 08/21 1:49 PM
Reply to Related [+] /Defendants Reply to Trustee's Response to Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 27 Objection filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
Friday, August 16, 2024
28 28 answer Objection Fri 08/16 9:23 PM
Trustee's Objection to Related [+] Trustee's Objection to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (King, Jacob)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
Att: 1 Brief in Response
Sunday, August 11, 2024
27 27 18 pgs answer Objection Sun 08/11 4:41 PM
Objection to Related [+] filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel. (Rukavina, Davor)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
Friday, August 02, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of hearing Fri 08/02 9:50 AM
Notice of hearing /Combined Notice of (I) Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint and (II) Status Conference on Defendants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 8/29/2024 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm for16 and for16 and for15 , Status Conference to be held on 8/29/2024 at 01:30 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support # 2 Proposed Order),16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)
Thursday, August 01, 2024
23 23 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 08/01 11:23 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Dale K. Cathell for Direct Resources, LLC; Internet & Telephone, LLC; MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.; Onepath Holding Corporation; Onepath Holdings, LLC; Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.; Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC; Onepath Systems of NC, LLC; Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.; 1Path Managed Services, LLC and BlueWave Computing, LLC (related document19 ) Entered on 7/30/2024.
22 22 court BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document Thu 08/01 11:23 PM
BNC certificate of mailing - PDF document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 20 Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Brett Ingerman for Direct Resources, LLC; Internet & Telephone, LLC; MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.; Onepath Holding Corporation; Onepath Holdings, LLC; Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.; Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC; Onepath Systems of NC, LLC; Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.; 1Path Managed Services, LLC and BlueWave Computing, LLC (related document18 ) Entered on 7/30/2024.
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
21 21 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/30 6:39 AM
Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Dale K. Cathell for Direct Resources, LLC; Internet & Telephone, LLC; MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.; Onepath Holding Corporation; Onepath Holdings, LLC; Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.; Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC; Onepath Systems of NC, LLC; Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.; 1Path Managed Services, LLC and BlueWave Computing, LLC Related [+] Entered on 7/30/2024. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 19
20 20 order Appear pro hac vice Tue 07/30 6:33 AM
Order granting motion to appear pro hac vice adding Brett Ingerman for Direct Resources, LLC; Internet & Telephone, LLC; MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.; Onepath Holding Corporation; Onepath Holdings, LLC; Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc.; Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC; Onepath Systems of NC, LLC; Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.; 1Path Managed Services, LLC and BlueWave Computing, LLC Related [+] Entered on 7/30/2024. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 18
Thursday, July 25, 2024
19 19 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 07/25 10:53 AM
Motion to appear pro hac vice for Dale K. Cathell. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 07/25 10:51 AM
Motion to appear pro hac vice for Brett Ingerman. Fee Amount $100 Filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Thu 07/25 10:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 24-03037 mvl] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number A31627389, amount $ 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#18
crditcrd none Thu 07/25 10:57 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 24-03037 mvl] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 100.00). Receipt number A31627389, amount $ 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#19
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
17 17 court Clerk's correspondence Wed 07/24 12:11 PM
Clerk's correspondence requesting to file notice of status conference hearing from attorney for defendant. Related [+] Responses due by 7/26/2024. (Whitaker, Sheniqua)
Related: [-] 16 Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) filed by Defendant MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Defendant 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Defendant Onepath Holdings, LLC, Defendant Onepath Holding Corporation, Defendant BlueWave Computing, LLC, Defendant Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Defendant Direct Resources, LLC, Defendant Internet & Telephone, LLC, Defendant Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.
16 16 9 pgs motion Withdrawal of reference Wed 07/24 11:14 AM
Motion for withdrawal of reference. Fee amount $199, filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
crditcrd none Wed 07/24 11:18 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Motion for withdrawal of reference([LINK 24-03037 mvl] ) [motion,mwdref] ( 199.00). Receipt number A31623214, amount $ 199.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#16
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 2 pgs motion Dismiss adversary proceeding Mon 07/15 1:38 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding / Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Trustee's Original Complaint filed by Defendants 1Path Managed Services, LLC, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P., Onepath Holding Corporation, Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. (Zollinger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 32 pgs Brief in Support
Att: 2 2 pgs Proposed Order
Friday, May 31, 2024
14 14 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:53 PM
Summons service executed on Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:52 PM
Summons service executed on Internet & Telephone, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
12 12 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:50 PM
Summons service executed on Direct Resources, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
11 11 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:49 PM
Summons service executed on Onepath Systems of NC, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:47 PM
Summons service executed on BlueWave Computing, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
9 9 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:46 PM
Summons service executed on Onepath Holding Corporation 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:45 PM
Summons service executed on Onepath Holdings, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:44 PM
Summons service executed on Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc. 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
6 6 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:42 PM
Summons service executed on Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:34 PM
Summons service executed on 1Path Managed Services, LLC 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
4 4 cmp Summons service executed Fri 05/31 3:32 PM
Summons service executed on MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P. 5/29/2024 (White, Conor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
3 3 order Standing scheduling order in an adversary proceeding Tue 05/28 2:51 PM
Scheduling order setting deadlines. Discovery and all exhibits except impeachment documents: 45 days prior to Docket Call, pre-trial order: 7 calendar days prior to Docket Call, proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law: 7 days prior to first scheduled docket call Related [+]. Trial Docket Call date set for 11/5/2024 at 01:15 PM Dallas Judge Larson Ctrm. Entered on 5/28/2024 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Scott M. Seidel
2 2 court Summons issued Tue 05/28 2:48 PM
Summons issued on 1Path Managed Services, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; BlueWave Computing, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; Direct Resources, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; Internet & Telephone, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P. Answer Due 6/27/2024; Onepath Holding Corporation Answer Due 6/27/2024; Onepath Holdings, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc. Answer Due 6/27/2024; Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; Onepath Systems of NC, LLC Answer Due 6/27/2024; Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc. Answer Due 6/27/2024 (Harden, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
1 1 39 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 05/24 7:48 PM
Adversary case 24-03037 Complaint by Scott M. Seidel against MSouth Equity Partners III, L.P.,, 1Path Managed Services, LLC, Onepath ITDS Holdings, LLC, Onepath ITDS Buyer, Inc., Onepath Holdings, LLC, Onepath Holding Corporation, BlueWave Computing, LLC, Onepath Systems of NC, LLC, Direct Resources, LLC, Internet & Telephone, LLC, Paradigm Computer Consulting, Inc.. Fee Amount $350. Nature(s) of suit: 13 Related [+]. 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)). (Rukavina, Davor)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer
Att: 1 Cover Sheet