Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-01123

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:24-ap-80031
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 28, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Orbit Marketing, LLC
7017 S. Westnedge Ave.
Portage, MI 49002
Represented By
Orbit Marketing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Sunlight Financial, LLC
234 W. 39th Street 7th Floor
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Sunlight Financial, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Zachary Wheeler
Represented By
Gabriel S Sanchez
Clipeus Law, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Heidi Wheeler
Represented By
Gabriel S Sanchez
Clipeus Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
48 48 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Dismissal Thu 11/28 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Dismissal Notice Date 11/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
47 47 2 pgs order Judgment Mon 11/25 1:53 PM
Judgment in an Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 11/25/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zachary Wheeler, Plaintiff Heidi Wheeler
46 46 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/25 1:49 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 11/25/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss40
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
45 45 2 pgs order Leave to Amend Complaint Wed 11/13 3:58 PM
Order Related [+] Signed on 11/13/2024. (lmj)
Related: [-] 34 Motion
misc Proof of Mailing Wed 11/13 8:22 AM
Proof of Mailing: A copy of Order was mailed upon Nicholas Scott Laue and A. Todd Almassian at Keller & Almassian PLC, 230 E. Fulton Street, Grand Rapids, MI 49503 by the United States Postal Service on 11/13/2024 Related [+] (lmj)
Related: [-] 44 Order
court Hearing Held Thu 11/14 12:13 PM
Hearing Held. Related [+] Denied without prejudice for failure to appear - Court to prepare Order. (tas)
Related: [-] 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint
misc Proof of Mailing Wed 11/13 4:00 PM
Proof of Mailing: A copy of Order was mailed upon at Nicholas Scott Laue and A. Todd Almassian at Keller & Almassian PLC, 230 E. Fulton Street, Grand Rapids, MI 49503 by the United States Postal Service on 11/13/2024 Related [+] (lmj)
Related: [-] 45 Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
44 44 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/12 4:51 PM
Order Related [+] Signed on 11/12/2024. (ks)
Related: [-] 43
43 43 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/12 12:47 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiffs Heidi Wheeler, Zachary Wheeler (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
42 42 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/02 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
41 41 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Wed 10/30 3:32 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 10/30/2024 (lmj)
Related: [-] 40 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Interested Party Kelly M. Hagan
Monday, October 28, 2024
40 40 7 pgs motion Dismiss Party Mon 10/28 10:46 AM
Motion to Dismiss Orbit Marketing, LLC/Chapter 7 Trustee from Proceeding. Filed by Interested Party Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing Fri 10/25 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing. Notice Date 10/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/25 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 10/23 3:37 PM
Hearing Held. Related [+] Mooted by Order entered 10/22/24. (tas)
Related: [-] 13 Defendant Sunlight Financial LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding Complaint - Adj.
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
37 37 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Tue 10/22 3:31 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 10/22/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,30 Stipulation
36 36 court Hearing Set (Court's Notice of Hearing) Tue 10/22 8:56 AM
Court's Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/13/2024 at 11:00 AM Kalamazoo Courthouse. Notice served by the court upon: Gabriel S. Sanchez, Esq., A. Todd Almassian, Esq., Kevin M. Smith, Esq. (via CM/ECF) and Orbit Marketing, LLC (via regular U.S. Mail). (tas)
Related: [-] 34 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Adversary Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zachary Wheeler, Plaintiff Heidi Wheeler
Monday, October 21, 2024
35 35 answer Response Mon 10/21 2:17 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Trustee Kelly M. Hagan (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-] 30 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,31 Order (Generic/Motion)
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Interested Parties)
34 34 motion Leave to Amend Complaint Mon 10/21 11:27 AM
Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Filed by Plaintiffs Heidi Wheeler, Zachary Wheeler (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
33 33 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Mon 10/21 11:13 AM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Trustee Kelly M. Hagan. (Smith, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/11 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Tue 10/08 1:28 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 10/8/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulated Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Complaint Solely With Respect to Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC
Monday, October 07, 2024
30 30 2 pgs motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/07 7:54 AM
Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Solely With Respect to Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC Filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
29 29 2 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 10/03 4:59 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/30 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 09/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
27 27 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Fri 09/27 1:24 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 9/27/2024 (lmj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Zachary Wheeler, Plaintiff Heidi Wheeler
Thursday, September 19, 2024
26 26 order Withdraw As Attorney Fri 09/20 8:14 AM
Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw from Representation Related [+] Signed on 9/19/2024. (kap)
Related: [-] 20
court Hearing Continued (ADI) Thu 09/19 2:05 PM
Adjourned Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at Kalamazoo Courthouse. (ADI)
Related: [-] 13 Defendant Sunlight Financial LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding Complaint
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Affidavit/Certificate of No Objection Wed 09/18 9:40 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of No Response or Objection Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 20 Corrected Motion of James R. Oppenhuizen to Withdraw as Attorney
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Mon 09/16 7:08 AM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 9/13/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding,15 Court's Notice of Hearing
Thursday, September 12, 2024
22 22 misc Brief Thu 09/12 5:11 PM
Brief in Reply Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Monday, August 26, 2024
21 21 answer Response Mon 08/26 4:21 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Plaintiffs Heidi Wheeler, Zachary Wheeler (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, August 22, 2024
20 20 motion Withdraw As Attorney Thu 08/22 12:34 PM
Corrected Motion of James R. Oppenhuizen to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 court Notice Regarding Filed Document Thu 08/22 12:05 PM
Notice Regarding Filed Document Related [+] (lmt)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC
18 18 notice Notice of Opportunity to Object Thu 08/22 11:25 AM
Notice of Opportunity to Object Related [+] Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 17 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Interested Parties)
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 08/21 9:16 PM
Motion of James R. Oppenhuizen to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing Sat 08/03 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice of Hearing. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 2 pgs court Hearing Set (Court's Notice of Hearing) Wed 07/31 10:07 AM
Court's Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 9/19/2024 at 11:00 AM Kalamazoo Courthouse. Notice served by the court upon: Gabriel S. Sanchez, Esq., James R. Oppenhuizen, Esq., A. Todd Almassian, Esq., and all parties requesting electronic notification. (tas)
Related: [-] 13 Defendant Sunlight Financial LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding Complaint filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC
Monday, July 29, 2024
14 14 23 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/29 3:13 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Orbit Marketing, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Interested Parties)
13 13 2 pgs motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/29 2:36 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sunlight Financial, LLC's Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Adversary Proceeding Complaint
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
12 12 order Extend Time Thu 06/27 11:29 AM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Response to Complaint Related [+] Signed on 6/26/2024. (lmj)
Related: [-] 10
11 11 order Extend Time Wed 06/26 9:04 AM
Order Granting Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File a Response to Complaint Related [+] Signed on 6/26/2024. (klb)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
10 10 motion Extend Time Tue 06/25 1:56 PM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File File Response to Complaint Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Tue 06/25 1:55 PM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, James) Modified on 6/26/2024 (dr.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Interested Parties)
Monday, June 24, 2024
8 8 motion Extend Time Mon 06/24 8:44 AM
Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to File Answer to Complaint Filed by Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Thu 06/20 3:43 PM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC. (Laue, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
6 6 appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Thu 06/20 3:42 PM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Sunlight Financial, LLC. (Almassian, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/03 10:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on Sunlight Financial, LLC 6/3/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/03 9:57 PM
Summons Service Executed on Orbit Marketing, LLC 6/3/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 06/03 12:28 PM
Summons Service Executed on Orbit Marketing, LLC 6/3/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 05/29 12:27 PM
Summons Issued on Orbit Marketing, LLC Date Issued 5/29/2024, Answer Due 6/28/2024; Sunlight Financial, LLC Date Issued 5/29/2024, Answer Due 6/28/2024 (lmj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/28 7:37 PM
Adversary case 24-80031 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) 14 Related [+]) 91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint by Zachary Wheeler, Heidi Wheeler against Orbit Marketing, LLC, Sunlight Financial, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other