Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:24-bk-01123
Case Filed:Apr 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Orbit Marketing, LLC
7017 S. Westnedge Ave.
Portage, MI 49002
Represented By
James R. Oppenhuizen
Oppenhuizen Law Firm, PLC
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday May 29, 2024 2:05 PM EDT
Creditor
1st Source Bank
May Oberfell Lorber 4100 Edison Lakes Pkwy. Suite 100
Mishawaka, IN 46545
Represented By
Katherine Everett Iskin
May Oberfell Lorber
contact info
Creditor
ACAR Leasing Ltd. d/b/a GM Financial Leasing
P O Box 183853
Arlington, TX 76096
Creditor
ACAR Leasing, LTD d/b/a GM Financial Leasing, as Agent or Servicer for Wells Fargo
P.O. Box 183853
Arlington, TX 76096
Represented By
S. Thomas Padgett
Debrincat Padgett
contact info
Creditor
Honor Credit Union
Represented By
Karen L. Rowse-Oberle
Butler Rowse-Oberle PLLC
contact info
Creditor
LAFCU
Zousmer Law Group PLC Michael I. Zousmer 4190 Telegraph Rd., Ste. 3000
Bloomfield Hills, MI 48302
Represented By
Michael I. Zousmer
Zousmer Law Group PLC
contact info
Creditor
M Dewey, LLC
Represented By
Lana Maria Escamilla
Lewis Reed & Allen, P. C.
contact info
Creditor
Wells Fargo Commercial Distribution Finance, LLC
Represented By
Marc M. Bakst
Bodman LLP
contact info
Creditor
Kathleen Williams
3820 S Waverly Rd
Eaton Rapids, MI 48827
Represented By
David A. Williams
Attorney At Law
contact info
Interested Party
Consolidated Electrical Distributors, Inc., d/b/a Greentech
Represented By
Kay Standridge Kress
Pepper Hamilton LLP
contact info
Interested Party
State of Michigan
Michigan Department of Attorney General P.O. Box 30736
Lansing, MI 48909
Represented By
Michael S. Hill
Michigan Department Of Attorney General
contact info
Other Professional
John W. Polderman
Simon PLC Attorneys & Counselors 363 W. Big Beaver Road Suite 410
Troy, MI 48084
U.S. Trustee
Kenneth G Lau
DOJ-Ust 125 Ottawa Avenue NW Suite 200r
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

GPO Feb 07 2025
Memorandum of Decision and Order. (RE: related document(s)263 Ex Parte Motion for 2004 Examination filed by Trustee Kelly M. Hagan). Signed on 2/7/2025 (kap)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Saturday, April 27, 2024
crditcrd none Sat 04/27 2:21 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-01123 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt number A17189372, amount $1738.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 114 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Sat 04/27 2:20 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs misc Disclosure of Compensation of Atty. for Debtor - BR 2016 Statement Sat 04/27 2:20 PM
BR 2016 Disclosure of Compensation. Filed by James R. Oppenhuizen (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs misc Corporate Resolution Sat 04/27 2:23 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Debtor Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 12 pgs misc Affidavit Sat 04/27 2:27 PM
Affidavit Solemn Declaration of Joshua L. Thompson, Sole Member of Orbit Marketing, LLC in Support of Filing Related [+] Filed by Debtor Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)