Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11188

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-11208
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Healthy Choice Compounding LLC
250 Clearbrook Rd
Elmsford, NY 10523-1305
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Monday, October 14, 2024
7 7 claims Request for Service of Notices Mon 10/14 3:45 PM
Request for Service of Notices. Filed by American Express National Bank. (Butler, Larry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/03 3:50 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Healthy Choice Compounding LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 07/03 3:48 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Healthy Choice Compounding LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/11 10:28 AM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of Cases and (II) Waiving Requirements of Bankruptcy Code Section 342(c)(1) and Bankruptcy Rules 1005 and 2002(n). An order has been entered in accordance with Rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing joint administration for procedural purposes only of the chapter 11 cases of: Braun Pharma, LLC, 24-11189 Dr. Ikes PharmaCare LLC, 24-11195 Rose Pharmacy SA LLC, 24-11203 Rose Pharmacy SF LLC, 24-11204 Rose Pharmacy RM LLC, 24-11202 Pet Apothecary LLC, 24-11191 Crestview Holdings, LLC, 24-11193 SBH Medical LLC, 24-11200 H&H Pharmacy LLC, 24-11197 Enovex Pharmacy LLC, 24-11196 SMC Pharmacy LLC, 24-11198 SMC Lyons Holdings LLC, 24-11199 Baybridge Pharmacy, LLC, 24-11205 Central Pharmacy, LLC, 24-11206 Pro Pharmacy, LLC, 24-11207 Healthy Choice Compounding LLC, 24-11208 Healthy Choice Compounding LLC, 24-11209 Oakdell Compounding Pharmacy LLC, 24-11210 The Pet Apothecary LLC, 24-11192 Crestview Pharmacy, LLC, 24-11194 SBH Medical, Ltd., 24-11201 Concierge Pharmacy LLC, 24-11211 Firstcare Pharmacy LLC, 24-11212 Easycare Pharmacy LLC, 24-11213 Primecare Pharmacy LLC, 24-11214 and HCP Pharmacy LLC, 24-11190 The docket for Optio Rx, LLC, Case. No. 24-11188 (TMH), should be consulted for all matters affecting these cases. Signed on 6/11/2024 (AMH)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 09, 2024
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Sun 06/09 2:07 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Baybridge Pharmacy, LLC, Braun Pharma, LLC, Central Pharmacy, LLC, Concierge Pharmacy LLC, Crestview Holdings, LLC, Crestview Pharmacy, LLC, Dr. Ike's PharmaCare LLC, Easycare Pharmacy LLC, Enovex Pharmacy LLC, Firstcare Pharmacy LLC, H&H Pharmacy LLC, HCP Pharmacy LLC, Healthy Choice Compounding LLC, Healthy Choice Compounding LLC, Oakdell Compounding Pharmacy LLC, Optio Rx, LLC, Pet Apothecary LLC, Primecare Pharmacy LLC, Pro Pharmacy, LLC, Rose Pharmacy RM LLC, Rose Pharmacy SA LLC, Rose Pharmacy SF LLC, SBH Medical LLC, SBH Medical, Ltd., SMC Lyons Holdings LLC, SMC Pharmacy LLC, The Pet Apothecary LLC. (Olivere, Mark)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 08, 2024
2 2 crditcrd none Sat 06/08 1:52 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11208 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11631053, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
1 1 30+ pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 06/07 9:17 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Healthy Choice Compounding LLC. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]