Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-bk-11188
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 17, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Optio Rx, LLC
3701 Commercial Avenue Suite 14
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
Mark D. Olivere
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
David W. Carickhoff
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Adam D. Cole
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Alan Michael Root
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Apr 10, 2025 5:26 PM EDT
Claims Agent
Stretto
www.stretto.com 410 Exchange, Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Cred. Comm. Chair
PIA Holdings, Inc.
8973 Lakes Blvd
West Palm Beach, FL 33412
Cred. Comm. Chair
Aves Management LLC
150 N. Riverside Plaza Suite 5200
Chicago, IL 60606
Cred. Comm. Chair
Baybridge Pharmacy Corp.
1842 Gardenia Ave.
Merrick, NY 11566
Creditor
Bexar County
sLinebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o Don Stecker 112 E. Pecan Street, Suite 2200
San Antonio, TX 78205
Represented By
Don Stecker
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Rinku Patel
Represented By
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Goldstein & Mcclintock Lllp
contact info
Amrit S. Kapai
Dunn Law, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
NYIP Owner II LLC
Represented By
Tara L. Lattomus
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Nicholas Alexander Pasalides
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Creditor
Pouya Farzadfar
1702 South Robertson Blvd #332
Los Angeles, CA 90035
Creditor
Delco Pharmacy Corp.
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
PIA Holdings, Inc.
8973 Lakes Blvd
West Palm Beach, FL 33412
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Greg Savino
221 W. 10th Street, 4th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Jordana Siegel
221 W. 10th Street, 4th Floor
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Baybridge Pharmacy Corp.
1842 Gardenia Ave.
Merrick, NY 11566
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
121 Central Pharmacy Corp.
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Pareto Optio LLC
Represented By
Alyson T. Fiedler
contact info
Louis T. DeLucia
Ice Miller LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Turner Falk
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Evan T. Miller
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Jorge Garcia
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Evan T. Miller
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Nicholas Smargiassi
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Michelle G. Novick
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Financial Advisor
Paladin Management Group, LLC
Represented By
Mary F. Caloway
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski, Stang, Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Loan Admin Co LLC
Represented By
Stuart M. Brown
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Matthew Steven Sarna
Dla Piper Llp (us)
contact info
Interested Party
Skin Medicinals LLC
Represented By
Matthew B. Harvey
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell, LLP
contact info
Howard Kaplan
Kaplan & Grady LLP
contact info
Jed Glickstein
Kaplan & Grady LLP
contact info
Austin Park
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Payam Tizabgar
381 N. Bonhill Road
Los Angeles, CA 90049
Interested Party
Marc Wank
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Interested Party
Bryan Henderson
30 South Spring Street
Pensacola, FL 32502
Represented By
Sally B Fox
Emmanuel Sheppard And Condon PA
contact info
Interested Party
Cardinal Health 112, LLC
Represented By
Terri Jane Freedman
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Scott Alan Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Interested Party
Cardinal Health 110, LLC
Represented By
Terri Jane Freedman
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Adam Hiller
Hiller Law, LLC
contact info
Scott Alan Zuber
Chiesa Shahinian & Giantomasi PC
contact info
Interested Party
Ad Hoc Group of Mezz Lenders
Represented By
Christopher M. Samis
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Ryan Blaine Bennett
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Maria Kotsiras
Potter Anderson & Corroon LLP
contact info
Peter A. Candel
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Zak Piech
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Levi Akkerman
Potter Anderson & Corroon
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
TERMINATED PARTIES
Creditor Committee
Professional Compounding Centers, Inc.
Terminated: 06/25/2024
9901 S. Wilcrest Dr.
Houston, TX 77099


Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
864 864 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Thu 05/01 4:29 PM
Application for Compensation Third Monthly and Final Fee Application of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC For Payment of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Financial Advisor to The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period September 1, 2024 to March 21, 2025 (Monthly) and for the period June 27, 2024 to March 21, 2025 (Final) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/22/2025. (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
863 863 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Wed 04/30 4:44 PM
Application for Compensation Ninth Monthly and Final Fee Application of Saul Ewing LLP, Counsel to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for the period March 1, 2025 to March 21, 2025 (Monthly) and for the period June 26, 2024 through March 21, 2025 (Final) Filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 6/2/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 3rd Fl., Courtroom #7, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (Miller, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Friday, April 25, 2025
862 862 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 04/25 5:04 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Ninth Monthly and Final Application of Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP, for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the Monthly Period From March 1, 2025 Through and Including March 21, 2025, and the Final Period From June 7, 2024 Through and Including March 21, 2025 (Docket No. 857) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 857