Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20002

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:24-ap-02004
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2024
Terminated:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Grun Properties, LLC
4 Middle Road
Cumberland, ME 04021
Represented By
George J. Marcus, Esq.
Marcus Clegg
contact info
Party in Interest
Sachem Capital Corp.
Represented By
Randy J. Creswell, Esq.
Creswell Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Green SIP Construction, Inc.
110 Marginal Way Unit 110
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Andrew L. Broaddus, Esq.
Andrew Broaddus
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
23 23 court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/24 11:33 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2004 has been closed administratively, but not pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). Additional pleadings, motions and other papers may be filed in this adversary proceeding without filing a motion to re-open. (rmp)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 09/24 10:38 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal, with Prejudice and Without Costs, and Certificate of Service Filed by Sachem Capital Corp. Related [+]. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/24 11:32 AM
Disposition of Adversary. (rmp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
21 21 answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 08/23 4:10 PM
Answer to Crossclaim Filed by Grun Properties, LLC. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 08/16 12:38 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 08/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Pre-Trial Scheduling Order.
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
19 19 order Pre-Trial Scheduling Order Tue 08/13 11:45 AM
Pre-Trial Scheduling Order. Final Pretrial to be set at close of discovery period or as stated in order. Related [+] Trial date set for 3/6/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
18 18 court Minutes of Proceedings Tue 08/13 10:28 AM
Minute Entry: Appearances: David C. Johnson, Esq., Andrew L. Broaddus, Esq., Randy J. Creswell, Esq.. Related [+]. Pretrial Conferencel held; Court to issue Pretrial Scheduling Order. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal Filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
17 17 audio Tue 08/13 9:27 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/13/2024 9:03:44 AM ]. File Size [ 4802 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:13:20 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
16 16 misc Amended Document Mon 08/12 10:34 AM
Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim, and Crossclaim Filed by Sachem Capital Corp. Related [+]. (kaf)
Related: [-] 12 Answer to Complaint filed by Cross-Claimant Sachem Capital Corp., Party in Interest Sachem Capital Corp., Crossclaim
Att: 1 Ex A_Note
Att: 2 Ex B_ Nov_Mechanics_Lien
Att: 3 Ex C_Mar_Mechanics_Lien
Att: 4 Ex D_Notice_Letter_Green_SIP
Monday, August 05, 2024
15 15 misc Rule 26(f) Report Mon 08/05 2:57 PM
Rule 26(f) Report Filed by Sachem Capital Corp. Related [+]. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Issued
Thursday, August 01, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/01 8:50 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Grun Properties, LLC. (Marcus, George)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
13 13 utility Update Other Deadlines (Adv) Tue 07/30 12:20 PM
Other Deadlines Updated (Adv). Cross-claim Answer/Reply due by 8/20/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer|cmp Answer to Complaint|Crossclaim Tue 07/30 11:09 AM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses , Crossclaim by Sachem Capital Corp. against Grun Properties, LLC Filed by Sachem Capital Corp.. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Commercial Note)
Att: 2 Exhibit C (Cumberland Mortgage)
Att: 3 Exhibit E (Account Statements)
Att: 4 Exhibit F (March Default Notice)
Att: 5 Exhibit H (Acceleration Notice)
Att: 6 Exhibit I (Notice of Foreclosure and Deficiency)
Att: 7 Exhibit J (Notice of Lack Insurance)
Att: 8 Exhibit K (Second Notice Lack of Insurnance)
Att: 9 Exhibit L (P&S Agreement)
Att: 10 Exhibit M (Closing Statement)
Att: 11 Exhibit N (June 2024 Billing Statement)
Thursday, July 25, 2024
11 11 misc Acceptance of Service Thu 07/25 2:28 PM
Acceptance of Service of Sachem Capital Corp. Filed by Green SIP Construction, Inc.. (Broaddus, Andrew) Modified on 7/26/2024 (kaf)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/25 2:22 PM
Acceptance of Service of Grun Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Broaddus, Andrew) Modified on 7/26/2024 (kaf)
Related: [-] 8 Summons Issued
Thursday, July 04, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Fri 07/05 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order on Document
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 court Summons Issued Tue 07/02 3:38 PM
Summons Issued on Grun Properties, LLC Date Issued 7/2/2024, Answer Due 8/1/2024 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 8/13/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/6/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Document Tue 07/02 2:10 PM
Order Establishing Deadlines and Setting Pretrial Conference. Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc. shall serve the verified Complaint on or before July 31, 2024 Related [+] (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
6 6 court Minutes of Proceedings Tue 07/02 12:14 PM
Minute Entry: Appearances: Randy J. Creswell, Esq., Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.. Related [+]. Status Conference held; Court to issue order. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal Filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
5 5 audio Tue 07/02 10:27 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/2/2024 8:58:32 AM ]. File Size [ 12627 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:35:05 ]. (courtaudio)
Related: [-]
utility Update Other Deadlines (Adv) Tue 07/02 2:12 PM
Other Deadlines Updated (Adv). Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc shall serve the verified Complaint on or before 7/31/2024. (kaf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
4 4 misc Document Tue 06/18 12:47 PM
Representation of Completeness of Removed Civil Proceeding Filings, with Certificate of Service Filed by Sachem Capital Corp.. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certified Copy of Docket Sheet Removed Action
Att: 2 Verified Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet
Saturday, June 15, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document**ADI** Sun 06/16 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+]. Notice Date 06/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Hearing
Thursday, June 13, 2024
2 2 court Hearing Set (misc-event pdf) Thu 06/13 3:50 PM
hearing Set O Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 7/2/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. (kaf)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Green SIP Construction, Inc.
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 06/13 3:01 PM
Notice of Removal filed by Sachem Capital Corp. Fee Amount due $ 350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)) (kaf) Modified on 6/13/2024 to reflect correct party filer (kaf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Complaint