KY USA Energy, Inc.
Kentucky Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Joan A Lloyd |
Case #: | 1:10-bk-11424 |
Case Filed: | Sep 14, 2010 |
Creditor Meeting: | Dec 09, 2010 |
Dismissed: | Jul 23, 2012 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2012 |
Debtor
KY USA Energy, Inc.
P O Box 3008
London, KY 40743 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
US Trustee
Joseph J. Golden
Office of the U.S. Trustee 601 W. Broadway #512
Louisville, KY 40202 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 12:01 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 07, 2012 | ||
324 | 324 Final Decree, discharging trustee, if applicable, and canceling bond. CASE CLOSED. (Ernst, K) |