Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-11188

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Thomas M Horan
Case #: 1:24-ap-50079
Nature of Suit72 Bankruptcy - Injunctive relief - other
Case Filed:Jun 17, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Optio Rx, LLC
3701 Commercial Avenue Suite 14
Northbrook, IL 60062
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Defendant
BEN DAVID
Represented By
BEN DAVID
contact info
Defendant
Arun Suresh Kumar
Represented By
Arun Suresh Kumar
contact info
Defendant
Lisa Bassett Ippolito
Represented By
Lisa Bassett Ippolito
contact info
Plaintiff
Skin Medicinals LLC
Represented By
Matthew O Talmo
Morris, Nichols Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info

GPO Aug 13 2024
Supplemental Ruling Denying Skin Medicinals LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (related document(s)4, 5, 15, 23, 47, 56, 58, 79) (AMH)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
204 204 misc Exhibit Tue 04/01 3:25 PM
Exhibit(s) // Defendants' Notice of Payment Related [+] Filed by Optio Rx, LLC. (Queroli, David)
Related: [-] 200 ,201
203 203 notice Withdrawal - Notice Tue 04/01 3:14 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Service of Defendant's Fifth Set of Requests for Production to Skin Medicinals LLC Related [+] Filed by Optio Rx, LLC (Javorsky, Zachary)
Related: [-] 202
202 202 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/01 2:18 PM
(DOC WITHDRAWN SEE DOC203 ) Notice of Service of Defendant's Fifth Set of Requests for Production to Skin Medicinals LLC Filed by Optio Rx, LLC (Queroli, David)Modified on 4/2/2025 (IJW)
Related: [-]