New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-bk-16134
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Oct 04, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Global Benefits Group, Inc.
902 Carnegie Center Drive Suite 100
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
Andrew H. Sherman
Sills Cummis & Gross, P.C.
contact info
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Gregory Kopacz
Sills Cummis & Gross, PC
contact info
Oleh Matviyishyn
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Last checked: Thursday Feb 27, 2025 4:26 PM EST
Broker
Hilco Digital Assets, LLC
Creditor
Baptist Health South Florida, Inc.
Represented By
Rachel A. Parisi
Porzio Bromberg & Newman
contact info
Creditor
Trawick International, Inc.
Represented By
Jordan W Gerheim
Outside Chief Legal LLC
contact info
Bruce J. Wisotsky
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
1000 Waterford Operating LP
Represented By
Robert L. LeHane
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Creditor
Bank of America, N.A.
Attn. Daniel Flores & J. Alex Kress 1270 Avenue of the Americas 30th Floor
New York, NY 10020
Represented By
J. Alex Kress
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Creditor
Trawick International GbmH
Represented By
Jordan W Gerheim
Outside Chief Legal LLC
contact info
Bruce J. Wisotsky
Norris Mclaughlin, P.A.
contact info
Creditor
GBG Insurance Limited
Represented By
Brian Morgan
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Creditor
LEAF Capital Funding, LLC
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, P.C. Four Greentree Centre 601 Route 73 North, Ste. 305
Marlton, NJ 08503
Represented By
Nicola G. Suglia
Fleischer, Fleischer & Suglia, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
International Claims Services, Inc.
902 Carnegie Center Drive, Suite 100
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
GBG Holding Incorporated
902 Carnegie Center Drive, Suite 100
Princeton, NJ 08540
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Liquidation Trustee
Halperin Battaglia Benzja LLP 40 Wall Street, 37th Floor
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Noticing Agent
Stretto
410 Exchange Ste 100
Irvine, CA 92602
Other Prof.
Getzler Henrich & Associates LLC
295 Madison Avenue
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Trustee
Joseph L Schwartz - TR
Riker Danzig Scherer hyland & Perretti LLP One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962
Represented By
Joseph L. Schwartz
Riker, Danig, Scherer, Hyland, Perretti
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Sponder
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info
Lauren Bielskie
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
293 293 misc Certificate of Service Fri 05/02 11:30 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by S. Jason Teele on behalf of Liquidation Trustee. (Teele, S. Jason)
Related: [-] 292 Objection filed by Interested Party Liquidation Trustee
292 292 answer Objection Fri 05/02 10:01 AM
Objection to - Liquidation Trustee's Objection to Claim No. 30 of GBG Insurance Limited. filed by S. Jason Teele on behalf of Liquidation Trustee. (Teele, S. Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
291 291 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 04/26 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]