Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-16134

New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christine M Gravelle
Case #: 3:24-bk-16137
Case Filed:Jun 18, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
International Claims Services, Inc.
902 Carnegie Ctr Ste 100
Princeton, NJ 08540-6530
Represented By
S. Jason Teele
Sills Cummis & Gross P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 77 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
court Hearing Held Tue 07/23 11:56 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Vacated Related [+] (mjb)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton.
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
9 9 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 07/09 12:32 PM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/14/2024 at 11:00 AM at Telephonic. (llb) DOCKETED FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2024 (llb)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 23, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 06/24 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Mon 06/24 12:19 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
6 6 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Fri 06/21 5:30 PM
Notice of Appointment of Joseph L Schwartz - TR as Subchapter V Trustee filed by U.S. Trustee. U.S. Trustee. (United States Trustee, by Martha Hildebrandt, Assistant United States Trustee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Verified Statement of Joseph L. Schwartz
5 5 order Show Cause Fri 06/21 2:46 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Balance Sheet, Cash Flow Statement, Statement of Operations, Statement Indicating why a Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash Flow Statement, or Tax Return is not being filed (if applicable), Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 6/21/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 11:00 AM at CMG - Courtroom 3, Trenton. (mrg)
Related: [-]
4 4 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Joint Administration - multi case Fri 06/21 10:43 AM
Order on Motion For Joint Administration. Lead Case: 24-16134 Member Cases: 24-16135 24-16137. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice.. (dmi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
3 3 motion Joint Administration Tue 06/18 4:56 PM
Motion for Joint Administration for the following cases: 24-16134 24-16135 24-16137 Filed by S. Jason Teele on behalf of International Claims Services, Inc.. (Teele, S. Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assigned Tue 06/18 4:38 PM
Case Assignment. Judge Christine M. Gravelle added to the case. (nrf)
Related: [-]
1 1 322 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 06/18 4:31 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by S. Jason Teele on behalf of International Claims Services, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 09/16/2024. (Teele, S. Jason)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Tue 06/18 4:44 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-16137 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46896247, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1