Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:24-bk-01123

Michigan Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott W Dales
Case #: 1:24-ap-80035
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Jun 19, 2024
Terminated:Dec 20, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Orbit Marketing, LLC
7017 S. Westnedge Ave.
Portage, MI 49002
Represented By
Orbit Marketing, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Regions Bank
2222 Arlington Ave South
Birmingham, AL 35255
Represented By
Regions Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
David Gardner
Represented By
Gabriel S Sanchez
Clipeus Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, December 26, 2024
27 27 utility Returned Mail (ADI) Thu 12/26 2:45 AM
Notice of Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 12/04/2024 to Regions Bank 2222 Arlington Ave South Birmingham, AL 35205-4004 was returned as undeliverable: Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. This is a text-only entry. There are no documents attached. (ADI)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/05 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 12/05 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Dismissal Thu 12/05 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Dismissal Notice Date 12/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Judgment Mon 12/02 12:56 PM
Judgment in an Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. Signed on 12/2/2024 (kap)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Gardner
22 22 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 12/02 12:48 PM
Order. Signed on 12/2/2024 (kap)
Related: [-]
misc Proof of Mailing Mon 12/02 12:52 PM
Proof of Mailing: A copy of Order was sent to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on December 2, 2024 for service upon Orbit Marketing, LLC and Kevin Smith, Esq. at their respective address appearing in the records of the Court. Related [+] (kap)
Related: [-] 22 Order
misc Proof of Mailing Mon 12/02 12:58 PM
Proof of Mailing: A copy of Judgment in an Adversary Proceeding was sent to the Bankruptcy Noticing Center on December 2, 2024 for service upon Kevin M. Smith, Esq. at their respective address appearing in the records of the Court. Related [+] (kap)
Related: [-] 23 Judgment in an Adversary Proceeding
Friday, November 15, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/16 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 11/15/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order (Generic/Motion) Wed 11/13 4:11 PM
Order Related [+]. Signed on 11/13/2024 (lmj)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Gardner
court Hearing Held Thu 11/14 12:12 PM
Hearing Held. Related [+] Matter taken under advisement. (ADI)
Related: [-] 14 Pretrial Conference
Thursday, November 07, 2024
19 19 1 pgs court Letter Thu 11/07 1:33 PM
Letter from the Honorable Scott W. Dales to Gabriel S. Sanchez, Esq., Orbit Marketing, LLC and Regions Bank Regarding: Rule 26(f) statement. Related [+] (kap)
Related: [-] 14 Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference
Sunday, October 06, 2024
18 18 utility Returned Mail (ADI) Sun 10/06 2:36 AM
Notice of Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 09/20/2024 to Regions Bank 2222 Arlington Ave South Birmingham, AL 35205-4004 was returned as undeliverable: Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference. This is a text-only entry. There are no documents attached. (ADI)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/21 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 09/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Withdraw As Attorney Fri 09/20 8:16 AM
Order Regarding Motion to Withdraw from Representation Related [+] Signed on 9/19/2024. (kap)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice and Entry of Default Thu 09/19 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Court's Notice and Entry of Default Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs court Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference Wed 09/18 10:12 AM
Order Establishing Dates for 7026(f) Conference, Filing Discovery Plan and Scheduling Pretrial Conference. Parties shall meet in person or telephonically at least once on or before the pretrial conference is held to satisfy requirements pursuant to FRBP 7026(f). A report signed by all parties outlining discovery plan shall be filed with the Court on or before 14 days after 7026(f) conference. Signed on: 9/18/2024. Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 11:00 AM at Kalamazoo Courthouse. (tas)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Gardner
13 13 misc Affidavit/Certificate of No Objection Wed 09/18 9:55 AM
Affidavit/Certificate of No Response or Objection Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 10 Motion of James R. Oppenhuizen to Withdraw as Attorney
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 1 pgs court Clerks Entry of Default Mon 09/16 11:04 AM
Clerk's Entry and Notice of Default Against Regions Bank (dr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Opportunity to Object Thu 08/22 11:28 AM
Notice of Opportunity to Object Related [+] Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC.(Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Att: 1 Certificate of Service (Interested Parties)
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
10 10 motion Withdraw As Attorney Wed 08/21 9:23 PM
Motion of James R. Oppenhuizen to Withdraw as Attorney Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Mon 07/29 3:16 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 3 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/24 12:42 PM
Summons Service Executed on Regions Bank 6/26/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/24 12:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Orbit Marketing, LLC 7/24/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 07/24 12:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on Orbit Marketing, LLC 6/26/2024 (Sanchez, Gabriel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
5 5 misc Certificate of Service (Do Not Use for Service of Summons) Mon 07/22 2:30 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+]. Filed by Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-] 3 Answer to Complaint,4 Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices
4 4 2 pgs appr Ntc of Appearance, Appr on Special Matrix or Request for Notices Mon 07/22 2:29 PM
Notice of Appearance on behalf of Defendant Orbit Marketing, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 24 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/22 2:28 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Orbit Marketing, LLC. (Oppenhuizen, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 06/20 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on Orbit Marketing, LLC Date Issued 6/20/2024, Answer Due 7/22/2024; Regions Bank Date Issued 6/20/2024, Answer Due 7/22/2024 (klb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 19, 2024
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 06/19 1:18 PM
Adversary case 24-80035 91 (Declaratory judgment)) 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) : Complaint by David Gardner, Gabriel S Sanchez against Orbit Marketing, LLC, Regions Bank. Fee Amount $350. (Sanchez, Gabriel) Modified on 6/20/2024 (lmt)
Related: [-]