North Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shon Hastings
Case #: 3:24-bk-30281
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC
400 10th St SE
Minot, ND 58701-4908
Represented By
Steven R Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Robert B. Raschke
Assistant U.S. Trustee Suite 1015 U.S. Courthouse 300 South Fourth Street
Minneapolis, MN 55415


1. EPIC Companies files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (kfyrtv.com)
Submitted Thu 07/11/2024
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
300 300 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:58 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: William LaCrosse To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
299 299 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:56 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Larry & Candice Dietz - DBA Dietz Proper (Claim No. 17) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
298 298 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:54 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Dietz Properties LLC (Claim No. 18) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
297 297 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:52 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Flaten Holdings LLC To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
296 296 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:50 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Jane Merrill (Claim No. 9) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
295 295 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:49 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: Second Chance To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
294 294 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:46 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Eric Myhre (Claim No. 22) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
293 293 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:44 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Craig Edward Geron (Claim No. 82) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
292 292 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:41 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Steve & Elaine Gehrtz To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
291 291 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:39 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Katie Breyer (Claim No. 121) To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
290 290 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:37 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Beth Postemski To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
289 289 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:36 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: Paul Antonucci To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
288 288 claims Transfer of Claim Thu 05/08 2:33 PM
Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferor: 7 Mile Holdings, LLC To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd. Fee Amount $28 To Hain Capital Investors Master Fund, Ltd.301 Route 17 North, Suite 816ARutherford, NJ 07070 Filed by Creditor Hain Capital Group. (Rapoport, Amanda)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 05/08 3:01 PM
Receipt of Transfer of Claim([LINK 24-30281 ) [claims,trclm] ( 28.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A1622379. Fee amount 28.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
287 287 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 05/06 12:51 PM
Notice of Hearing on Approval of Disclosure Statement Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM Quentin N. Burdick U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 2nd Floor, 655 1st Ave. N., Fargo, ND 58102. Objections to Debtors' Disclosure Statement shall be filed by Thursday, June 5, 2025 . If the Court receives no objections to the Disclosure Statement, the Court may approve the Disclosure Statement without a hearing. Attorney Steven Kinsella to serve notice . (sfh)
Related: [-] 286
Monday, May 05, 2025
286 286 44 pgs plan Disclosure Statement Mon 05/05 2:51 PM
Disclosure Statement Filed by Debtor EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]
285 285 plan Chapter 11 Plan Mon 05/05 2:50 PM
Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Debtor EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
284 284 order Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Fri 05/02 4:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Settlement RE: Northern Mall Partners, LLC. Related [+]. Signed on 5/2/2025 (vck)
Related: [-] 270
283 283 motion Employ Fri 05/02 1:33 PM
Application to Employ Creative Planning, LLC as Tax Accountant Including: Notice of Motion served on 5/2/2025 Filed by Debtor EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC Last day to object is 05/16/2025. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]
282 282 motion Compensation Fri 05/02 8:35 AM
Application for Compensation (Eighth) of Stinson LLP for Benjamin Court, Creditor Comm. Aty, Period: 3/1/2025 to 3/31/2025, Fee: $19036.50, Expenses: $570.25. Including: Notice of Application served on 5/2/2025 Filed by Attorney Benjamin Court Last day to object is 05/23/2025. (Court, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
281 281 order Compensation Thu 05/01 3:43 PM
Order Approving First Application for Allowance of Fees and Expenses for Mark Western and Fremstad Law Office as Special Litigation Counsel for the Debtors from 1/1/2025 through 3/31/2025 Related [+] fees awarded: $5,358.50, expenses awarded: $700.00, for a total of $6,058.50. This compensation is approved under 11 U.S.C. § 330 and allowed as an administrative expense under 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(2). By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only) Signed on 5/1/2025 (vck)
Related: [-] 269
280 280 order Compensation Thu 05/01 3:25 PM
Order Approving Eighth Application for Allowance of Fees and Expenses for Steven R. Kinsella and Fredrickson & Byron, P.A. as Counsel for the Debtors from 3/1/25 through 3/31/25 Related [+] fees awarded: $66,860.50, expenses awarded: $3,837.50 for a total of $70,698.00. This compensation is approved under 11 U.S.C. § 330 and allowed as an administrative expense under 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(2). By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only) Signed on 5/1/2025 (vck)
Related: [-] 266
279 279 order Compensation Thu 05/01 3:19 PM
Order Approving Seventh Application for Allowance of Fees and Expenses for Benjamin J. Court and Stinson LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors from 2/1/2025 through 2/28/2025 Related [+] fees awarded: $16,390.50, expenses awarded: $0.00, for a total of $16,390.50. This compensation is approved under 11 U.S.C. § 330 and allowed as an administrative expense under 11 U.S.C. § 503(b)(2). By Judge Shon Hastings. (Text order only) Signed on 5/1/2025 (vck)
Related: [-] 265