Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30281

North Dakota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Shon Hastings
Case #: 3:25-ap-07014
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
CBE, LLC
3509 Interstate Blvd South
Fargo, ND 58103
Represented By
CBE, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC
900 Long Lake Road Ste. 180
New Brighton, MN 55112
Represented By
Steven R Kinsella
Fredrikson & Byron, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 misc Affidavit Thu 05/08 8:40 AM
Affidavit Filed by Plaintiff EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC ( related document(s)7 Motion for Default Judgment). (Nixon, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 court Notice of Returned Mail Wed 05/07 11:51 AM
Notice of Returned Mail for Defendant CBE, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiffs to serve returned documents and file certificate of service updating Defendant's address Related [+] (vck)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 18, 2025
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/18 1:11 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC Related [+]. (Nixon, Katherine)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Against CBE, LLC Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/17/2025
Thursday, April 17, 2025
7 7 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/17 3:05 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against CBE, LLC Including: Notice of Motion served on 4/17/2025 Filed by Plaintiff EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC Last day to object is 05/8/2025. (Nixon, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/16 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 04/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, April 14, 2025
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/14 10:26 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (vck)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 03/14 11:33 AM
Summons Service Executed on CBE, LLC 3/11/2025 (Nixon, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 03/11 12:26 PM
Summons Issued on CBE, LLC Date Issued 3/11/2025, Answer Due 4/10/2025 (vck)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 03/10 4:44 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Plaintiff EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC. (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/10 3:58 PM
Adversary case 25-07014 Complaint by EPIC Companies Midwest, LLC against CBE, LLC. Fee Amount $350. Nature of Suits:(14 (Recovery of money/property - other),13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (Kinsella, Steven)
Related: [-]