California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:24-bk-15398
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $50,001 to $100,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
FAB 5 LLC
4445 Dundee Dr
Los Angeles, CA 90027-1211
Represented By
Carolyn Lindholm
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017
Represented By
Ron Maroko
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/08/2024 5:00 PM PDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 07/09 3:19 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by FAB 5 LLC List of Equity Security Holders due 7/23/2024. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 7/23/2024. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 7/23/2024. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 7/23/2024. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 7/23/2024. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 7/23/2024. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 7/23/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 7/23/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 7/23/2024. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 7/23/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 7/23/2024. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 7/23/2024. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 7/23/2024. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 7/23/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 7/23/2024. Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 10/7/2024. (KC2) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/9/2024 (KC2)
Related: [-]
2 2 court X - Receipt Number and Filing Fee (Generic) (Auto - CR/ECF)(Retired) Tue 07/09 7:30 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Filing Fee - $1,738.00 by KC. Receipt Number 22002204. (admin)
Related: [-]