Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-15398

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-01219
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Terminated:Dec 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Tucalota Creek Ranch, Inc.
Represented By
Tucalota Creek Ranch, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Tucalota Creek Ranch Inc as the alter ego of Alan Needle and Kay Needle
Represented By
Tucalota Creek Ranch Inc as the alter ego of Alan Needle and Kay Needle
contact info
Defendant
Alan Needle
Represented By
Alan Needle
contact info
Defendant
Kay Needle
Represented By
Kay Needle
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Represented By
Does 1 through 50, inclusive
contact info
Plaintiff
FAB 5 LLC
4445 Dundee Dr
Los Angeles, CA 90027
Represented By
Carolyn Lindholm
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Lindholm
Represented By
Carolyn Lindholm
contact info
Trustee
Carolyn A Dye (TR)
Law Offices of Carolyn Dye 15030 Ventura Blvd., Suite 527
Sherman Oaks, CA 91403
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
6 6 court Close Adversary Case Tue 12/03 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-1219 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (TM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 10, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/10 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 08, 2024
4 4 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Fri 11/08 3:28 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding for Failure to Prosecute (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/8/2024 Related [+]. (PP)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Lindholm, Plaintiff FAB 5 LLC
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
3 3 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Tue 09/03 4:18 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Lindholm, Plaintiff FAB 5 LLC
2 2 court Summons Issued Tue 09/03 4:15 PM
Summons Issued on Does 1 through 50, inclusive Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024; Alan Needle Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024; Kay Needle Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024; Tucalota Creek Ranch Inc as the alter ego of Alan Needle and Kay Needle Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024; Tucalota Creek Ranch, Inc. Date Issued 9/3/2024, Answer Due 10/3/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/6/2024 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Robert Lindholm, Plaintiff FAB 5 LLC
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/03 2:52 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-01219. Complaint by FAB 5 LLC , Robert Lindholm against Tucalota Creek Ranch, Inc. , Tucalota Creek Ranch Inc as the alter ego of Alan Needle and Kay Needle , Alan Needle , Kay Needle , Does 1 through 50, inclusive . ($350.00 Fee Not Required). Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)); 21 Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property (SM)
Related: [-]