Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:24-ap-01172
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Josiah McCauley
10940 S. Parker Road, Suite 204
Parker, CO 80134
Represented By
Josiah McCauley
contact info
Plaintiff
MountainSky Landscaping, LLC
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, November 28, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/28 10:19 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 7016 Scheduling Order
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
12 12 order 7016 Scheduling Order (Adversary) Tue 11/26 8:36 AM
Scheduling Order for Pre-Trial Deadlines Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7016(b) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b)). Related [+]. Discovery due by 6/19/2025 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 7/10/2025 for1 , Amended Pleadings due by 12/4/2024 for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, November 25, 2024
11 11 misc 7026 (f) Report Mon 11/25 2:15 PM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report. Filed by Defendant Josiah McCauley. Related [+]. (mmg)
Related: [-] 8 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
10 10 misc 7026 (f) Report Mon 11/25 9:02 AM
F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 8 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Friday, October 25, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/25 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
8 8 order Compliance With Rules Wed 10/23 1:16 PM
Order Regarding Compliance With Rule 7026, FED.R.BANKR.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.). Related [+]. Rules Compliance due by 11/25/2024 for1 , (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Answer to Complaint
Monday, October 07, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 1:39 PM
Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand Filed by Josiah McCauley Related [+]. (bw)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Sunday, September 08, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/08 10:18 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 2:34 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Josiah McCauley Answer Due 10/8/2024 Related [+]. (jss)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Mon 08/19 4:58 PM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Josiah McCauley Related [+]. (mmg)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 07/24 12:03 PM
Summons Service Executed On: Josiah McCauley on July 24, 2024 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/24 12:01 PM
Summons Issued on Josiah McCauley Answer Due 08/23/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 11:59 AM
Adversary case 24-01172 Complaint by MountainSky Landscaping, LLC against Josiah McCauley. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 10/22/2024 (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]