Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-12744

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Kimberley H Tyson
Case #: 1:24-ap-01173
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Dec 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
National Funding, Inc.
Represented By
National Funding, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
MountainSky Landscaping, LLC
Represented By
David Wadsworth
Wadsworth Garber Warner Conrardy, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, December 12, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Thu 12/12 1:46 PM
Adversary Case Number 24-1173 Closed. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (Motion) Wed 11/27 1:14 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+]. (mmg)
Related: [-] 7 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 11/27 1:14 PM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 24-1173 KHT. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 12/11/2024. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/26 9:10 AM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC Related [+]. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Friday, September 27, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/27 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/27/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
5 5 order Abeyance Wed 09/25 4:36 PM
Order Granting Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Related [+]. Document due by 11/22/2024 for4 , (jss)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Hold Case In Abeyance
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
4 4 motion Abeyance Tue 09/24 1:04 PM
Motion To Hold Case In Abeyance Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
3 3 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Wed 07/24 12:20 PM
Summons Service Executed On: National Funding, Inc. on July 24, 2024 Filed by David Wadsworth on behalf of MountainSky Landscaping, LLC. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 07/24 12:17 PM
Summons Issued on National Funding, Inc. Answer Due 08/23/2024. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/24 12:16 PM
Adversary case 24-01173 Complaint by MountainSky Landscaping, LLC against National Funding, Inc.. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 10/22/2024 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Wadsworth, David)
Related: [-]