Member Case
Lead case is: 7:24-bk-70299

Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 1:24-bk-10428
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
205 Water St
Warren, PA 16365-2307
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Hampton
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 utility Update Meeting of Creditors Mon 09/23 10:13 AM
Update Meeting of Creditors, Deadlines Updated 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2024 at 10:00 AM via Ch 11 341 telephonic hearing. Last day to oppose dischargeability due by 12/30/2024. (mgut)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
11 11 misc Exhibit Thu 09/12 3:06 PM
Exhibit Amended Schedules of Assets and Liabilities Exhibit H Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] :9 Petition Completed filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
10 10 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Thu 09/12 12:53 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] : 5 Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 misc Petition Completed Tue 09/10 8:46 AM
Petition Completed Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs of Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
8 8 misc Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix - Local Bankruptcy Form 29 Thu 08/08 1:03 PM
Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mailing Matrix
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
7 7 court Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Wed 08/07 6:28 PM
Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Related [+]. (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
6 6 crditcrd none Tue 07/30 3:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-10428 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16823649, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
5 5 utility Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines Mon 07/29 12:55 PM
Deadlines Updated, Deadlines Updated, Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines Updated Related [+]. Atty Disclosure Statement due 8/12/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 8/12/2024. Schedule A/B due 8/12/2024. Schedule D due 8/12/2024. Schedule E/F due 8/12/2024. Schedule G due 8/12/2024. Schedule H due 8/12/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/12/2024. Summary of schedules due 8/12/2024. Mailing Matrix due 8/12/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/26/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 11/26/2024. (mgut)
Related: [-] : 4 Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies
4 4 court Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies Mon 07/29 12:54 PM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: DELLER. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: ATTORNEY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, SUMMARY OF SCHEDULES, SCHEDULES A/B, D, E/F, G AND H, DECLARATION OF SCHEDULES, STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS, LOCAL FORM 29/MAILING MATRIX, CHAPTER 11 PLAN AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Related [+]. (mgut)
Related: [-] :1 Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
3 3 13 pgs order Order -multi- Mon 07/29 12:30 PM
Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 7/29/2024. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC, d/b/a Richland Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Case No. 24-70299 (JAD)) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 24-70299 (JAD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (mgut)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 07/29 11:46 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph S. Sisca Filed by Creditor S&T Bank (Sisca, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 21 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 11 Mon 07/29 9:53 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Guardian Elder Care at Warren, LLC d/b/a Kinzua Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Government Proof of Claim due by 01/25/2025. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 08/12/2024. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]