Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffery A Deller
Case #: 7:24-bk-70299
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC
349 Vo Tech Dr
Johnstown, PA 15904-2926
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Hampton
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222

GPO Nov 15 2024
Memorandum Opinion cm: All Parties-In-Interest Signed on 11/15/2024. (RE: related document(s): 852 Notice). (obro)
GPO Feb 05 2025
Memorandum Opinion cm: All Parties-In-Interest Signed on 2/5/2025. (RE: related document(s): 932 Motion). (obro)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1654 1654 4 pgs order Order -Non-motion related- Thu 05/01 12:06 PM
Order Granting Limited Relief From The Automatic Stay With Respect To Personal Injury Claims Asserted By Sherry Graham, As Power Of Attorney For Nancy Smith. Signed on 5/1/2025. Related [+]. (obro)
Related: [-] :1542 Motion for Relief From Stay,1544 Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee,1646 Certification of Counsel Regarding
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
1653 1653 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Wed 04/30 11:25 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1633 Order -Non-motion related-
1652 1652 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Wed 04/30 11:24 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1632 Certification of Counsel Regarding
1651 1651 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Wed 04/30 8:44 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1637 Ombudsman Report
1650 1650 misc Notice Wed 04/30 11:18 AM
Notice Regarding Notice of Filing and Service of Debtors Third Ordinary Course Professional Quarterly Statement. Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] :288 Order -Non-motion related-
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Third OCP Quarterly Statement
1649 1649 misc Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee Wed 04/30 11:07 AM
Hearing on Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Interested Party Diane L. Streit Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM via p04 Courtroom D, 54th Floor, U.S. Steel Tower, Pittsburgh. Responses due by 5/17/2025. (Greene, Allison)
Related: [-] :1647 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Interested Party Diane L. Streit
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Service
1648 1648 crditcrd none Wed 04/30 11:01 AM
Receipt of Motion for Relief From Stay([LINK 24-70299 JAD] ) [motion,mrlfsty] ( 199.00) filing fee. Receipt number A17145978, amount $ 199.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1647 1647 motion Relief from Stay Wed 04/30 11:00 AM
Motion for Relief from Stay . Fee Amount $199. Filed by Interested Party Diane L. Streit. (Greene, Allison)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Email
Att: 3 Exhibit Settlement Order
1646 1646 misc Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26 Wed 04/30 10:58 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Submitting Revised Proposed Order Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay With Respect to Personal Injury Claims Asserted by Sherry Graham, as Power of Attorney for Nancy Smith Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] :1542 Motion for Relief From Stay filed by Creditor Sherry Graham, POA for Nancy Smith,1544 Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Creditor Sherry Graham, POA for Nancy Smith
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order
Monday, April 28, 2025
1645 1645 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Mon 04/28 11:46 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1629 Order on Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period
1644 1644 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Mon 04/28 3:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1625 Certification of Counsel Regarding
1643 1643 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Mon 04/28 3:32 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1621 Ombudsman Report
1642 1642 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Mon 04/28 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1619 Report,1620 Notice
Saturday, April 26, 2025
1641 1641 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/27 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :1633 Order -Non-motion related-
Friday, April 25, 2025
1640 1640 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/26 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] :1629 Order on Motion to Extend/Limit Exclusivity Period
1639 1639 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Fri 04/25 10:42 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1616 Declaration,1617 Notice
1638 1638 misc Notice Fri 04/25 2:44 PM
Notice Regarding Notice of Closing of Sale of Substantially All Assets of HUD Sellers and HUD Existing Operators Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, and Encumbrances. Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] :820 Order on Motion To Sell Property Free and Clear of Liens,1100 Notice filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC
1637 1637 misc Ombudsman Report Fri 04/25 1:18 PM
Fourth Sixty-Day Patient Care Ombudsman Report Filed by Ombudsman Health Care Suzanne E Messenger. (obro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
1636 1636 misc Certificate of Service - PAWB Form 7 Thu 04/24 11:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc. Related [+]. (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] :1571 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1572 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1573 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1574 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1575 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1576 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1577 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1578 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1579 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1580 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1581 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1582 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1583 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1584 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1585 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1586 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1587 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1588 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1589 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1590 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1591 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1592 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1593 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1594 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1595 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1596 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1597 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1598 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1599 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1600 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1601 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1602 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1603 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1604 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1605 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1606 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1607 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1608 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1609 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1610 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1611 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1612 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1613 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR,1614 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR
1635 1635 court Notice of Filing of Transcript Thu 04/24 5:31 PM
Notice of Filing of Transcript. Notice is hereby given that a transcript of the hearing held on 4/23/2025 on Stipulation By Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC and Between Stipulation Order Approving by and Among the Cuarzo Portfolio Debtors and S&T Bank, N.A.; and Second Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement Second Motion of the Debtors for Entry of an Order Further Extending the Debtors Exclusive Periods to File a Chapter 11 Plan and Solicit Votes Thereon has been filed. Transcripts are available for inspection only at the Clerk's Office or may be purchased from the Court Transcriber during the 90 day restriction period. Related [+]. (hsmi)
Related: [-] :1634 Transcript
1634 1634 court Transcript Thu 04/24 5:29 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 04/23/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to contact the transcriber, call the Clerk's Office or contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber Writer's Cramp, Inc., Telephone number 609-588-8043. Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 5/5/2025. Redaction Request due 5/15/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission due 5/27/2025. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted through 7/23/2025. (hsmi)
Related: [-] 1631 Transcript Request
1633 1633 12 pgs order Order -Non-motion related- Thu 04/24 11:34 AM
Order Approving First Amended Stipulation By And Among The Cuarzo Portfolio Debtors And S&T Bank. Signed on 4/24/2025. Related [+]. (obro)
Related: [-] :1632 Certification of Counsel Regarding
1632 1632 misc Certification of Counsel Regarding - PAWB Form 26 Thu 04/24 8:37 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Revised Proposed Order Approving First Amended Stipulation By and Among the Cuarzo Portfolio Debtors and S&T Bank Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC Related [+]. (Hampton, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] :1531 Stipulation filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC,1532 Hearing on a Judge Deller Case Set by Attorney or Trustee filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC,1559 Response filed by Creditor Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Department of Human Services,1560 Response filed by Creditor Cuarzo Healthcare Capital and its Affiliates,1561 Response filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Blackline - Amended Stipulation