Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Be
Member Case
Lead case is: 7:24-bk-70299
Lead case is: 7:24-bk-70299
Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffery A Deller |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-21822 |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Nature of Business | Health Care Business |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center
100 Little Dr
Lower Burrell, PA 15068-3345 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee
1000 Liberty Avenue Suite 1316
Pittsburgh, PA 15222 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
order
Fixing Deadline to Deny a Motion
Tue 10/29 8:25 AM
Text Order re: (12 Motion To Stay).. Without further notice or hearing, this pleading will be stricken without prejudice if the following action is not taken: MOTION TO BE REFILED BEING SURE TO CORRECT THE FOLLOWING: 1) PER THE ORDER ISSUED AT DOC. NO.3 , THIS CASE IS BEING JOINTLY ADMINISTERED AND ALL SUBSTANTIVE PLEADINGS MUST BE FILED AT THE LEAD CASE AT NO. 24-70299 2) WHEN REFILING THE MOTION ON THE LEAD CASE, PLEASE BE SURE TO SELECT THE APPROPRIATE ROLE TYPE OF 'CREDITOR,' NOT 'PLAINTIFF. 3) AFTER REFILING THE MOTION, IT MUST BE SELF-SCHEDULED AND A NOTICE OF HEARING FILED AS A SEPARATE EVENT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH JUDGE DELLER'S PROCEDURES AND FORMS, FOUND ON THE COURT'S WEBSITE. THE HEARING NOTICE MUST BE FILED USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER BANKRUPTCY / MISC / HEARING ON A JUDGE DELLER CASE SET BY ATTORNEY OR TRUSTEE, BEING SURE TO RELATE IT TO THE REFILED MOTION WHEN PROMPTED. 4) WHEN REFILING THE MOTION PLEASE BE SURE TO INCLUDE A FULL CASE CAPTION NAMING A MOVANT AND ANY RESPONDENT(S) IN ACCORDANCE WITH W.PA.LBR. 9004-1. 5) THE MOTION MUST BE REFILIED USING THE EVENT FOUND UNDER BANKRUPTCY / MOTIONS/APPLICATIONS / RELIEF FROM STAY AND PAY THE APPROPRIATE FEE. 6) A PROPOSED ORDER MUST ACCOMPANY ANY MOTION/APPLICATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH W.PA.LBR 9013-4. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's order and notice on this matter. Judge Deller Signed on 10/29/2024. . Required corrective action due on or before 11/6/2024. (obro) Modified on 10/29/2024 (obro) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Motion To Stay Relief Filed by Ernest S. Young (Phillips, Laura) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
utility
Update Meeting of Creditors
Mon 09/23 9:59 AM
Update Meeting of Creditors, Deadlines Updated 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/31/2024 at 10:00 AM via Ch 11 341 telephonic hearing. Last day to oppose dischargeability due by 12/30/2024. (mgut) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center . (Hampton, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Petition Completed Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs of Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Hampton, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice Regarding Filing of Mailing Matrix Filed by Debtor Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Hampton, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Declaration Re: Electronic Filing . (mgut) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
crditcrd
none
Tue 07/30 9:12 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition Chapter 11([LINK 24-21822 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A16822985, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
utility
Update Incomplete Filings Deadlines
Mon 07/29 5:35 PM
Deadlines Updated, Deadlines Updated, Plan, Amended Plan, Disclosure Statement, or Objection to Disclosure Statement Deadlines Updated . Atty Disclosure Statement due 8/12/2024. Declaration of Schedules due 8/12/2024. Schedule A/B due 8/12/2024. Schedule D due 8/12/2024. Schedule E/F due 8/12/2024. Schedule G due 8/12/2024. Schedule H due 8/12/2024. Statement of Financial Affairs due 8/12/2024. Summary of schedules due 8/12/2024. Mailing Matrix due 8/12/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 11/26/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 11/26/2024. (mgut) |
|
4 | 4
court
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies
Mon 07/29 5:33 PM
Notice of Additional Filing Deficiencies. Assigned Judge: DELLER. Pursuant to Local Rule 1017-2, the United States Trustee is deemed to have filed a Motion To Dismiss this case, and that Motion will be deemed GRANTED, if any deadline set forth in the first docket entry or any of the following deadlines is not met. Incomplete Filings: ATTORNEY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT, SUMMARY OF SCHEDULES, SCHEDULES A/B, D, E/F, G AND H, DECLARATION OF SCHEDULES, STATEMENT OF FINANCIAL AFFAIRS, LOCAL FORM 29/MAILING MATRIX, CHAPTER 11 PLAN AND DISCLOSURE STATEMENT . (mgut) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Order Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 7/29/2024. An order has been entered in this case consolidating this case with the case of Guardian Elder Care at Johnstown, LLC, d/b/a Richland Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center (Case No. 24-70299 (JAD)) for procedural purposes only and providing for its joint administration in accordance with the terms thereof. The docket in Case No. 24-70299 (JAD) should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (mgut) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Joseph S. Sisca Filed by Creditor S&T Bank (Sisca, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Guardian Elder Care at Lower Burrell, LLC d/b/a Belair Healthcare and Rehabilitation Center Government Proof of Claim due by 01/25/2025. Declaration Re: Electronic Filing due 08/12/2024. (Hampton, Jeffrey) |