Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04233
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bridge Logistics Inc
5720 Chesterfield Drive
Fairfield, OH 45014
Represented By
Bridge Logistics Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 02/07 2:56 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/07 10:35 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Ashley J. Jericho with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Wed 02/05 2:42 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/21/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 2:41 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4233 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/05 2:43 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4233 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
14 14 court Copy of Wed 02/05 2:41 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against: (1) Reko International Group, Inc. (AP 24-4339 , (2) Groz-Beckert USA, Inc. (AP 24-4268 , (3) Bridge Logistics Inc (AP 24-4233 , (4) Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. (AP 24-4313 , AND (5) Woodbridge Foam Corporation (AP 24-4263 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Thu 11/21 4:46 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time For Bridge Logistics Inc To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 11/20 4:44 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Stephen M. Gross Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Bridge Logistics Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
11 11 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/28 5:05 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Tue 09/24 3:38 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Bridge Logistics Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
9 9 misc Stipulation Tue 09/24 2:05 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Millerand Stephen M. Gross Re: Entry of Second Order Extending Time for Bridge Logistics Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Thu 08/29 3:57 PM
Order Extending Time for Bridge Logistics Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Thu 08/29 3:32 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Ashley J. Jericho Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Bridge Logistics Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/29 2:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Bridge Logistics Inc. (Jericho, Ashley)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/29 2:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Bridge Logistics Inc. (Gross, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/01 4:30 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bridge Logistics Inc 8/1/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 08/01 4:07 PM
Summons Issued on Bridge Logistics Inc Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 4:07 PM
Adversary case 24-04233 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Bridge Logistics Inc. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]