Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04237
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
DSV Road, Inc
801 Adlai Stevenson Drive
Springfield, IL 62703
Represented By
DSV Road, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
22 22 order stipulated order Wed 04/16 1:48 PM
Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
21 21 misc Stipulation Wed 04/16 1:13 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
20 20 order stipulated order Thu 03/20 4:23 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
19 19 misc Stipulation Thu 03/20 10:29 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
18 18 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 03/14 9:20 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time For DSV Road, Inc. To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
17 17 misc Stipulation Thu 03/13 4:57 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
16 16 order stipulated order Thu 02/13 11:38 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 02/13 9:23 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
14 14 order stipulated order Thu 01/09 11:57 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 11:02 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 order stipulated order Tue 12/03 8:55 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 12/02 3:20 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Fri 11/01 12:29 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, October 31, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 10/31 3:45 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Mon 09/30 8:22 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 09/27 4:47 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Second Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
6 6 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 08/20 3:59 PM
Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/3/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 08/20 10:36 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Molly J. Kjartanson Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for DSV Road, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 10:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/01 4:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on DSV Road, Inc 8/1/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 08/01 4:23 PM
Summons Issued on DSV Road, Inc Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 4:23 PM
Adversary case 24-04237 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against DSV Road, Inc. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]