Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04240
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Stein Fibers, LTD
Represented By
Stein Fibers, LTD
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Thu 09/26 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Stein Fibers, LTD Related [+]. (Diehl, Robert)
Related: [-] 11 Statement of Corporate Ownership
11 11 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 09/26 3:53 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Stein Fibers, LTD Related [+]. (Diehl, Robert)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/07 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Deficiency Notice
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 09/04 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service of Answer & Affirmative Defenses to Complaint to Recover Preferential Transfers and for Disallowance of Claims Filed by Defendant Stein Fibers, LTD Related [+]. (Diehl, Robert)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint
8 8 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Wed 09/04 10:25 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Statement of Corporate Ownership Missing. Related [+] Statement of Corporate Ownership Due on 9/11/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Stein Fibers, LTD
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
7 7 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 09/03 11:56 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing or Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 9/10/2024. (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Stein Fibers, LTD
Friday, August 30, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 11:49 AM
Answer to Complaint Defendant Stein Fibers Ltd.'s Answer and Affirm Defenses to Complaint to Recover Preferential Transfers and for Disallowance of Claims Filed by Stein Fibers, LTD. (Diehl, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Stein Fibers, LTD 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 3:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 11:15 AM
Summons Issued on Stein Fibers, LTD Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 11:15 AM
Adversary case 24-04240 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Stein Fibers, LTD. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A