Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04245
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Techmer PM, LLC
Represented By
Techmer PM, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Mon 03/31 8:49 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 25
25 25 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/28 11:30 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
24 24 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Wed 03/19 9:05 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 03/12/25, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 03/19 9:06 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4245 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/19 9:07 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4245 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
23 23 court Copy of Thu 03/13 10:46 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Techmer PM, LLC (Adv. Pro. No. 24-4245 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
22 22 order stipulated order Thu 01/30 11:51 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
21 21 misc Stipulation Thu 01/30 8:58 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
20 20 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/28 10:57 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 order stipulated order Fri 01/10 12:36 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Thursday, January 09, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 01/09 3:00 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
17 17 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 12/03 4:29 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 1/10/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 12/03 3:54 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
15 15 order stipulated order Wed 11/06 8:54 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 11/05 5:04 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/05 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Wed 10/02 1:09 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Techmer PM, LLC c/o Jeffrey A Nelson, 26879 Riverford Dr, Perrysburg, OH 43551-5457 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulated Order
11 11 order stipulated order Wed 10/02 11:49 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Tue 10/01 5:00 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 14, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/15 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/14/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Thu 09/12 3:01 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, Techmer PM, LLC, c/o Jeffrey A Nelson 26879 Riverford Dr Perrysburg OH 43551-5457 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
7 7 order stipulated order Thu 09/12 2:56 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 6:05 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeffrey A. Nelson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Techmer PM, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 1:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Techmer PM, LLC 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 11:51 AM
Summons Issued on Techmer PM, LLC Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 11:51 AM
Adversary case 24-04245 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Techmer PM, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A