Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04246
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC
Represented By
Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/17 8:45 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4246 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Mon 09/16 5:33 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
8 8 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 09/16 5:29 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/17 8:43 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4246 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
7 7 order stipulated order Fri 08/16 4:10 PM
Order Extending Time for Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company LLC, to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 08/16 3:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Susanna Gray Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Fri 08/16 4:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 8/16/24 by the United States Postal Service to the defendant, Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC c/o SUSANNA GRAY, at 8515 E. Orchard Road Greenwood Village, CO 80111. Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 12:50 PM
Summons Service Executed on Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:23 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 11:55 AM
Summons Issued on Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 11:55 AM
Adversary case 24-04246 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Empower Trust Company, LLC F/K/A Great West Trust Company, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A