Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04247
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Plastic Age Products, Inc.
Represented By
Plastic Age Products, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
28 28 order stipulated order Wed 04/23 4:09 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 27 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
27 27 misc Stipulation Wed 04/23 10:42 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 order stipulated order Fri 03/21 2:44 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 misc Stipulation Thu 03/20 4:20 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc., to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
24 24 order stipulated order Fri 02/21 3:43 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
23 23 misc Stipulation Fri 02/21 11:48 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
22 22 order stipulated order Mon 01/13 10:40 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Friday, January 10, 2025
21 21 misc Stipulation Fri 01/10 4:23 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
20 20 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Mon 12/23 9:24 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 1/22/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 12/20 3:46 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Withdrawal Fri 12/20 3:42 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
17 17 misc Stipulation Fri 12/20 3:29 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
16 16 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Thu 11/07 3:28 PM
Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 12/23/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 11/07 11:22 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 09/27 10:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Defendant's Attorney William L. Thompson, 480 Pierce Street Suite 300, Birmingham, MI 48009. Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulated Order
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
13 13 order stipulated order Thu 09/26 8:02 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
12 12 misc Stipulation Wed 09/25 10:04 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and William L. Thompson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Plastic Age Products, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 audio . Fri 09/20 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/20/2024 2:09:19 PM ]. File Size [ 16280 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:55 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Fri 09/20 7:39 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held. Matter Held in Abeyance until further Order of the Court Related [+] (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Motion Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Thursday, September 12, 2024
10 10 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 09/12 2:17 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 9/20/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for8 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 8 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
8 8 motion generic Motion Wed 09/11 3:52 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Order Directing Court Clerk to Issue Modified Summons Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 09/09 10:29 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR. Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Plastic Age Products, Inc. . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 9/16/2024. (KEC) Modified on 9/9/2024 (nlt)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 09/09 10:01 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Plastic Age Products, Inc. . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 9/16/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 12:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on Plastic Age Products, Inc. 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/02 12:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 11:59 AM
Summons Issued on Plastic Age Products, Inc. Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 11:59 AM
Adversary case 24-04247 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Plastic Age Products, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A