California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sheri Bluebond
Case #: 2:24-bk-16203
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Dismissed:Sep 13, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC, Debtor
3100 Donald Douglas Loop N Hngr 4
Santa Monica, CA 90405-3085
Represented By
Nicholas A Koffroth
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 26 minutes ago
Sunday, April 20, 2025
124 124 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 04/20 9:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 123 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, April 18, 2025
123 123 4 pgs order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Fri 04/18 2:58 PM
Order Overruling Objection To Fox Rothschilds Motion To Withdraw As Counsel And Denying Cross-Motion For Judicial Referral (BNC-PDF) Signed on 4/18/2025 Related [+]. (ME2)
Related: [-] 120 Opposition filed by Interested Party Matteo Patisso, Other Professional Matteo Patisso
Thursday, April 17, 2025
122 122 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 04/17 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 119 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
121 121 misc Declaration Wed 04/16 4:00 PM
Declaration Of Matteo Patisso In Support Of Opposition To Fox Rothschild's Motion To Withdraw As Counsel To Debtor And Cross-Motion For Judicial Referral Of Nicholas A. Koffroth, Esq., To State Bar Of California For Consideration Of Interim Suspension Order, Or In The Alternative, Cross-Motion To Reopen Case And Schedule An Evidentiary Hearing Into Fox's Misconduct Filed by Interested Party Matteo Patisso Related [+]. [EDB] (ME2)
Related: [-] 120 Opposition
120 120 answer Opposition Wed 04/16 3:58 PM
Opposition To Fox Rothschild's Motion To Withdraw As Counsel To Debtor And Cross-Motion For Judicial Referral Of Nicholas A. Koffroth, Esq, To State Bar Of Ca For Consideration Of Interim Suspension Order, Or In The Alternative, Cross-Motion To Reopen Case & Set Evidentiary Hearing Into Allegations Of Misconduct 1 Related [+] Filed by Interested Party Matteo Patisso EDB (ME2)
Related: [-] 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Notice of Motion and Fox Rothschild LLP's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel to Debtor; Declaration of Nicholas A. Koffroth in Support Thereof filed by Attorney Fox Rothschild LLP
Monday, April 14, 2025
119 119 order Withdraw As Attorney (BNC-PDF) Mon 04/14 7:19 PM
Order Granting Motion To Withdraw As Attorney (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 4/14/2025. (ME2)
Related: [-] 117