Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-16203

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Sandra R Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-01212
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
61 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(5), domestic support
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Terminated:Nov 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC
3100 Donald Douglas Loop North #4
Santa Monica, CA 90405
Represented By
Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Monique Strong
7507 Gloria Avenue
Van Nuys, CA 91407
Represented By
Robert M Ross
Klass, Helman & Ross
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, November 18, 2024
5 5 court Close Adversary Case Mon 11/18 8:47 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-1212 Closed. The complaint filed in the above case has been disposed of and is no longer pending due to the dismissal of the complaint or main case, the entry of a judgment or the transfer of the adversary proceeding to another division or district. Since it appears that no further matters are pending that require this adversary proceeding remain open, it is ordered that this adversary proceeding is closed. (TM)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sun 11/03 8:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF)
Friday, November 01, 2024
3 3 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Fri 11/01 1:39 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (BNC-PDF) Signed on 11/1/2024 Related [+]. (TM)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Monique Strong
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued Wed 08/28 12:06 PM
Summons Issued on Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC Date Issued 8/28/2024, Answer Due 9/27/2024; Kingsley & Associates LLC Date Issued 8/28/2024, Answer Due 9/27/2024; Brett Livingstone Strong Date Issued 8/28/2024, Answer Due 9/27/2024; Stason Strong Date Issued 8/28/2024, Answer Due 9/27/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 10/30/2024 at 09:00 AM at Crtrm 1575, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Sandra R. Klein (PP)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Monique Strong
Friday, August 23, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/23 4:43 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-01212. Complaint by Monique Strong against Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC, Jackson-Strong Alliance, LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))),(61 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(5), domestic support)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) (Ross, Robert)
Related: [-]