Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04249
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Argent International Inc.
Fred J Perenic, Resident Agent PO Box 701007
Plymouth, MI 48170
Represented By
Argent International Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 02/07 8:37 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 12:38 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Defendant, Argent International Inc. With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Fri 01/17 2:45 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/17 2:42 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4249 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/17 2:50 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4249 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
15 15 court Copy of Fri 01/17 2:41 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against Argent International (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 11/07 12:57 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
13 13 order stipulated order Tue 10/22 1:37 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
12 12 misc Stipulation Tue 10/22 12:59 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Argent International Inc. Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to November 29, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 order stipulated order Fri 09/27 8:50 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulated Order
10 10 order stipulated order Fri 09/27 8:36 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, September 26, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 09/26 3:10 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Argent International Inc. Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to October 30, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/30 3:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 order stipulated order Thu 08/29 3:56 PM
Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 08/29 12:20 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Argent Internatinal Inc. Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Argent International Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to October 3, 2024 with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 1:11 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 1:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:45 PM
Summons Service Executed on Argent International Inc. 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 2:44 PM
Summons Issued on Argent International Inc. Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 2:44 PM
Adversary case 24-04249 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Argent International Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]