Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04250
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bostik
CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 33 EAST MAIN STREET, SUITE 610
Madison, WI 53703
Represented By
Bostik
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
33 33 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Thu 05/01 12:14 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 32
32 32 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 05/01 9:18 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Bostik with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
31 31 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Thu 04/24 3:44 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 04/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 04/24 3:43 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4250 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 04/24 3:44 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4250 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
30 30 court Copy of Wed 04/16 4:03 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against Bostik, Inc. (Adv. Proc. No. 24-4250 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
29 29 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/13 3:10 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
28 28 order stipulated order Tue 03/11 1:52 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Bostik to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 27 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
27 27 misc Stipulation Tue 03/11 9:18 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Bostik Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Bostik to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to April 30, 2025) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
26 26 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Wed 01/08 5:00 PM
Stipulated Order Setting Aside Clerk's Entry Of Default And Extending Time For Bostik, Inc. To Answer Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 25 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
25 25 misc Stipulation Wed 01/08 3:19 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Bostik, Inc. Re: Entry of Order Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default and Extending Time for Bostik, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to March 17, 2025) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
24 24 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 12/18 4:05 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bostik 12/18/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
23 23 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 12/17 8:55 AM
Related: [-]
22 22 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 12/17 8:55 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Kenneth A. Nathan on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Withdrawal Mon 12/16 2:41 PM
Notice of Withdrawal Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+] Proposed Default Judgment and B) Affidavit in Support ). (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment with Exhbiits A
Friday, December 13, 2024
20 20 audio . Fri 12/13 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/13/2024 1:07:06 PM ]. File Size [ 4080 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:08:30 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn Fri 12/13 2:18 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held. Motion to be Withdrawn. Related [+] (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
19 19 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 11/12 4:57 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 12/13/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for17 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 17 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Friday, November 01, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/02 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Clerk's Entry of Default
Thursday, October 31, 2024
17 17 motion Default Judgment Thu 10/31 11:27 AM
Motion for Default Judgment with Exhbiits A) Proposed Default Judgment and B) Affidavit in Support Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
16 16 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 10/30 10:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of - Bostik (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
15 15 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 09/27 1:49 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bostik 9/26/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
14 14 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 09/26 1:14 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bostik 9/26/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
13 13 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 09/24 3:13 PM
Related: [-]
12 12 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 09/24 3:13 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Kenneth A. Nathan on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
11 11 order stipulated order Mon 09/23 5:00 PM
Order Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default (ECF No. 7) Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
10 10 notice Notice of Withdrawal Mon 09/23 1:57 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Bostik Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+] Default Judgment; B) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Bostik ). (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment with Exhibits A
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/16 2:14 PM
Motion for Default Judgment with Exhibits A) Default Judgment; B) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Bostik Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 09/09 10:24 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Bostik - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/23/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 2:43 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 1:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 1:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:44 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bostik 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 2:54 PM
Summons Issued on Bostik Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 2:54 PM
Adversary case 24-04250 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Bostik. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]