Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04260
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
CenturyLink Communications, LLC
4400 EASTON COMMONS WAY SUITE 125
COLUMBUS, OH 43219
Represented By
CenturyLink Communications, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/03 4:43 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC Related [+]. (Schumacher, Brandon)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/03 4:41 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Schumacher, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 08/29 8:29 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 8/29/24 by the United States Postal Service to the Defendant, CenturyLink Communications, LLC C/O Craig Friedrichs, at 931 14th St Denver CO 80202. Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulated Order
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 order stipulated order Thu 08/29 8:27 AM
Order Extending Time for CenturyLink Communications, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 08/28 4:14 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Craig Friedrichs Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for CenturyLink Communications, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 10:34 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 4:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on CenturyLink Communications, LLC 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 3:41 PM
Summons Issued on CenturyLink Communications, LLC Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 3:40 PM
Adversary case 24-04260 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against CenturyLink Communications, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]