Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04261
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Mar 19, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Halco USA
20269 Mack St
Hayward, CA 94545
Represented By
Halco USA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Fri 03/28 8:40 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/27 4:08 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Daniel N. Brogan with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
19 19 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Wed 03/19 8:59 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 03/12/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 03/19 8:59 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4261 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/19 9:00 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4261 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
18 18 court Copy of Thu 03/13 10:44 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Halco USA (Adv. Pro. No. 24-4261 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 order stipulated order Thu 01/23 3:48 PM
Stipulated Fifth Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
16 16 misc Stipulation Thu 01/23 3:07 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Daniel N. Brogan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/23 2:29 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 order stipulated order Tue 01/07 9:03 AM
Stipulated Fourth Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Monday, January 06, 2025
13 13 misc Stipulation Mon 01/06 3:48 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Daniel N. Brogan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
12 12 order stipulated order Tue 12/03 8:51 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 12/02 3:25 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jennifer R. Hoover Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Wed 10/02 4:02 PM
Stipulated Second Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 10/02 3:22 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jennifer R. Hoover Re: Entry of Second Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/07 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/06/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Wed 09/04 5:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Defendant's Attorney Jennifer Hoover 1313 North Market Street, Suite 1201 Wilmington, DE 19801 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 6 Order to Extend
6 6 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Wed 09/04 5:03 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time For Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 09/04 4:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jennifer R. Hoover Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Halco USA to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 4:25 PM
Summons Service Executed on Halco USA 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 3:44 PM
Summons Issued on Halco USA Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 3:44 PM
Adversary case 24-04261 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Halco USA. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]