Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04263
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Woodbridge Foam Corporation
1515 Equity Drive, Suite 100
Troy, MI 48084
Represented By
Woodbridge Foam Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 02/05 2:25 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 12:09 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Jim Morgan with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 2:25 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4263 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/05 2:27 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4263 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
18 18 court Copy of Wed 02/05 3:55 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against: (1) Reko International Group, Inc. (AP 24-4339 , (2) Groz-Beckert USA, Inc. (AP 24-4268 , (3) Bridge Logistics Inc (AP 24-4233 , (4) Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. (AP 24-4313 , AND (5) Woodbridge Foam Corporation (AP 24-4263 (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 01/21 1:45 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 2/20/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
14 14 misc Stipulation Tue 01/21 11:23 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jim Morgan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 order stipulated order Fri 11/22 8:29 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 11/21 3:37 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jim Morgan Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
11 11 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Fri 10/25 9:56 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Thu 10/24 4:17 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
9 9 misc Stipulation Thu 10/24 3:20 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jim Morgan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Fri 09/20 3:58 PM
Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 09/20 10:26 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jim Morgan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
6 6 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 09/03 2:31 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 9/24/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 09/03 10:36 AM
Stipulation By and Between Jeffrey H. Bigelman and Jim Morgan Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Woodbridge Foam Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Woodbridge Foam Corporation 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 3:50 PM
Summons Issued on Woodbridge Foam Corporation Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 3:50 PM
Adversary case 24-04263 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Woodbridge Foam Corporation. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]