Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04264
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Canada Revenue Agency
Represented By
Canada Revenue Agency
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 02/05 3:29 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 4:17 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4264 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/05 4:18 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4264 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 audio . Fri 09/20 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/20/2024 2:09:19 PM ]. File Size [ 16280 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:55 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Fri 09/20 7:44 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held. Matter Held in Abeyance until further Order of the Court Related [+] (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 6 Generic Motion Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 09/12 2:25 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 9/20/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for6 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 6 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
6 6 motion generic Motion Wed 09/11 2:12 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Order Directing Court Clerk to Issue Modified Summons Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 09/09 10:34 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Canada Revenue Agency . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 9/16/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 10:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/02 4:27 PM
Summons Service Executed on Canada Revenue Agency 8/2/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 3:54 PM
Summons Issued on Canada Revenue Agency Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 3:54 PM
Adversary case 24-04264 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Canada Revenue Agency. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]