Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04270
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
EFC International
C T CORPORATION SYSTEM 208 So Lasalle St, Suite 814
Chicago, IL 60604
Represented By
EFC International
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 02/12 2:38 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 23
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/11 2:44 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Defendant, EFC International With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
22 22 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Fri 01/17 9:37 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/17 9:37 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4270 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/17 9:38 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4270 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
21 21 court Copy of Fri 01/17 9:35 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against EFC International (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
20 20 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/30 1:02 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 order stipulated order Tue 10/29 4:11 PM
Stipulated Order extending Time for EFC International, to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 10/29 12:50 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, EFC International Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for EFC International to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to November 29, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
17 17 order stipulated order Fri 09/27 8:33 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for EFC International, to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Thu 09/26 2:01 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, EFC International Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for EFC International to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to October 30, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/28 12:35 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 14 Order to Extend
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
14 14 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 08/20 3:43 PM
Order Extending Time for EFC International, to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 9/30/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 08/20 5:44 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant EFC International Re: Extending Time for EFC International to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint [to September 30, 2024] with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 18, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/19 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
Friday, August 16, 2024
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 08/16 4:04 PM
Summons Service Executed on EFC International 8/16/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Reissued Summons (auto) Fri 08/16 3:24 PM
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Fri 08/16 3:24 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Kenneth A. Nathan on behalf of EFC International. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Fri 08/16 11:18 AM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant EFC International . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 8/23/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 1:18 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:06 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:31 PM
Summons Service Executed on EFC International 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 court Reissued Summons (auto) Mon 08/05 12:32 PM
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Mon 08/05 12:32 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by Kenneth A. Nathan on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 4:36 PM
Summons Issued on ECF International Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 4:36 PM
Adversary case 24-04270 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against ECF International. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]