Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04274
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Motion Industries, Inc.
C T CORPORATION SYSTEM 155 FEDERAL ST., STE 700
BOSTON, MA 02110
Represented By
Motion Industries, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 02/07 8:26 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 11:35 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Defendant, Motion Industries, Inc With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
12 12 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Mon 02/03 4:01 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 02/03 4:00 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4274 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/03 4:02 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4274 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
11 11 court Copy of Fri 01/17 3:10 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against Motion Industries, Inc. (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
10 10 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/26 12:03 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/28 12:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Extend
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 08/20 4:07 PM
Order Extending Time for Motion Industries, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 9/30/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 08/20 1:59 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Motion Industries, Inc. Re: Extending Time for Motion Industries, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to September 30, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 3:05 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Service Executed
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 2:56 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:08 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Motion Industries, Inc. 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 5:10 PM
Summons Issued on Motion Industries, Inc. Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 5:10 PM
Adversary case 24-04274 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Motion Industries, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]