Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04275
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 25, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Nitco Inc
NORTHWEST REGISTERED AGENT LLC 201 RUE BEAUREGARD, STE. 202
LAFAYETTE, LA 70508
Represented By
Nitco Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 order Default Judgment Wed 09/25 11:01 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 8
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Wed 09/25 11:02 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 09/25/2024 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participants at the Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court. Related [+] (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 09/25 11:04 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4275 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 09/25 11:05 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4275 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 09/16 3:32 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Nitco Inc with Exhibits A) Default Judgment; B) Affidavit in Support of Motion for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Nitco Inc Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/12 12:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 09/09 10:48 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Nitco Inc - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/23/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 2:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:09 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Nitco Inc 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 5:16 PM
Summons Issued on Nitco Inc Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 5:16 PM
Adversary case 24-04275 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Nitco Inc. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]