Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04277
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Palmer Bolt & Supply Co
WILLIAM S PALMER III Resident Agent 3802 W STATE ROUTE 185
PIQUA, OH 45356
Represented By
Palmer Bolt & Supply Co
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 02/07 8:17 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing of Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13
13 13 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/06 12:25 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Defendant, Palmer Bolt & Supply Co With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
12 12 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Fri 01/17 9:30 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/17 9:29 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4277 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/17 9:31 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4277 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
11 11 court Copy of Fri 01/17 9:24 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against Palmer Bolt & Supply (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
10 10 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/26 12:04 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/02 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, August 30, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 08/30 10:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Defendant, Palmer Bolt & Supply Co, C/O Keating Muething & Klekamp PLL, Jason V. Stitt, One East Fourth Street, Suite 1400, Cincinnati, OH 45202. Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Order to Extend
Thursday, August 29, 2024
7 7 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 08/30 10:02 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Palmer Bolt & Supply Co to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/3/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 08/29 4:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Palmer Bolt & Supply Co Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Palmer Bolt & Supply Co to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to October 3, 2024 with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 2:59 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on Palmer Bolt & Supply Co 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 5:23 PM
Summons Issued on Palmer Bolt & Supply Co Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 5:23 PM
Adversary case 24-04277 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Palmer Bolt & Supply Co. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]