Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04279
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Jan 17, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Pegatron Corporation
Represented By
Pegatron Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, February 13, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 02/14 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Tue 02/11 8:51 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Pegatron Corporation, Kuang-Chih Cheng, President & CEO, No. 96, Ligong Street, Beitou, Taipei 112, Taiwan Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Monday, February 10, 2025
16 16 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Tue 02/11 8:48 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Mon 02/10 1:49 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee, and Defendant, Pegatron Corporation With Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
14 14 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Fri 01/17 2:30 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/16/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Copy of Fri 01/17 2:29 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Against Pegatron Corporation (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 01/17 2:29 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4279 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 01/17 2:36 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4279 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/17 12:39 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/04 9:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Tue 10/01 10:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailin. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, Pegatron Corporation, c/o Structure Law Group, Attn Christopher G. Addy, 1754 Technology Drive, Suite 135, San Jose, CA 95110 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulated Order
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 order stipulated order Tue 10/01 8:53 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Pegatron Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 09/30 2:19 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Pegatron Corporation Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Pegatron to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint (to October 30, 2024) with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
7 7 order stipulated order Wed 08/28 1:55 PM
Order Extending Time for Pegatron Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 08/28 1:05 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Chapter 7 Trustee; and Defendant, Pegatron Corporation Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Pegatron Corporation to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to October 3, 2024 with proposed Order . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Wed 08/28 1:58 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 8/28/24 by the United States Postal Service to the Defendant, Pegatron Corporation C/O Christopher Addy, at 1754 Technology Drive Suite 135 San Jose CA 95110 . Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 3:00 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:26 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:15 PM
Summons Service Executed on Pegatron Corporation 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 5:31 PM
Summons Issued on Pegatron Corporation Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 5:31 PM
Adversary case 24-04279 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Pegatron Corporation. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]